EP0707691 - RUBBER UNIVERSAL JOINT DISC, ESPECIALLY FOR THE DRIVE TRAIN IN MOTOR VEHICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.02.1999 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.04.1999 [1999/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SGF SÜDDEUTSCHE GELENKSCHEIBENFABRIK GMBH & CO. KG. Graslitzer Strasse 14 84478 Waldkraiburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/17] | For all designated states SGF SÜDDEUTSCHE GELENKSCHEIBENFABRIK GMBH & CO. KG. Graslitzer Strasse 14 84478 Waldkraiburg / DE | ||
Former [1996/17] | For all designated states SGF SÜDDEUTSCHE GELENKSCHEIBENFABRIK GMBH & CO. KG. Graslitzer Strasse 14 D-84478 Waldkraiburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WÄHLING, Werner Sigiberstrasse 19 D-84559 Kraiburg a. Inn / DE | 02 /
MAIERBACHER, Georg Hacklthalerstrasse 23 D-83527 Kirchdorf b. Haag / DE | [1996/17] | Representative(s) | Goetz, Rupert, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/17] | Goetz, Rupert, Dipl.-Ing., et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94907549.3 | 11.02.1994 | [1996/17] | WO1994EP00396 | Priority number, date | DE19934304274 | 12.02.1993 Original published format: DE 4304274 | [1996/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9418467 | Date: | 18.08.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0707691 | Date: | 24.04.1996 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.08.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0707691 | Date: | 22.04.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.08.1994 | Classification | IPC: | F16D3/78, F16B21/20 | [1996/17] | CPC: |
F16D3/78 (EP,US);
F16D3/62 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1996/17] | Title | German: | GELENKSCHEIBE, INSBESONDERE FÜR DEN ANTRIEBSSTRANG IN KRAFTFAHRZEUGEN | [1996/17] | English: | RUBBER UNIVERSAL JOINT DISC, ESPECIALLY FOR THE DRIVE TRAIN IN MOTOR VEHICLES | [1996/17] | French: | DISQUE DE JOINT FLECTOR, NOTAMMENT POUR CHAINE CINEMATIQUE DE VEHICULES AUTOMOBILES | [1996/17] | Entry into regional phase | 20.06.1994 | National basic fee paid | 20.06.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.06.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.1994 | Examination requested [1996/17] | 23.06.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 01.08.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 10.09.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.11.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 11.11.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR837975 (BARRE); | [Y]DE936548 (ALBRECHT GUENTHER DIPL-ING) [Y] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE1021212 (KRAUSS MAFFEI AG); | [A]DE1040854 (EDUARD ERHARDT FA) [A] 1,4 * the whole document *; | [A]US3032807 (LANIUS JR JAMES C); | [A]FR2338411 (BAKER & FINNEMORE LTD [GB]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [DY]DE3942432 (SGF) [DY] 1 * the whole document * |