blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0752853

EP0752853 - HUMAN BRAIN PHOSPHODIESTERASE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.07.2006
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip28.07.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 30.08.2006  [2006/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION
One Franklin Plaza P.O. Box 7929
Philadelphia, PA 19101 / US
[N/P]
Former [2005/38]For all designated states
SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION
One Franklin Plaza, P.O. Box 7929
Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19101 / US
Former [2005/15]For all designated states
SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION
One Franklin Plaza, P.O. Box 7929
Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19101 / US
Former [1997/03]For all designated states
SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION
UW2220, 709 Swedeland Road, P.O. Box 1539
King of Prussia, PA 19406-0939 / US
Inventor(s)01 / LIVI, George P.
33 E. Langhorne Avenue
Havertown, PA 19083 / US
02 / Mc LAUGHLIN, Megan, M.
2505 Mansfield Avenue
Drexel Hill, PA 19026 / US
03 / TORPHY, Theodore J.
421 Shortridge Drive
Wynnewood, PA 19096 / US
[1997/03]
Representative(s)Rutter, Keith, et al
GlaxoSmithKline Corporate Intellectual Property (CN9.25.1) 980 Great West Road
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2005/15]Rutter, Keith, Dr., et al
GlaxoSmithKline Corporate Intellectual Property (CN9.25.1) 980 Great West Road
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
Former [1997/03]Rutter, Keith, Dr.
SmithKline Beecham plc Corporate Intellectual Property, Two New Horizons Court
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9EP / GB
Application number, filing date94911544.810.03.1994
[1997/03]
WO1994US02612
Priority number, dateUS1993002933410.03.1993         Original published format: US 29334
[1997/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9420079
Date:15.09.1994
Language:EN
[1994/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0752853
Date:15.01.1997
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.09.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1997/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0752853
Date:21.09.2005
Language:EN
[2005/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US15.09.1994
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.06.1997
ClassificationIPC:C12N15/55, C12N9/16, C12N15/81, C12N1/19, C12Q1/44, A61K31/00, C07K14/47
[2005/38]
CPC:
C12N9/16 (EP,US)
Former IPC [1997/29]C12N15/55, C12N9/16, C12N15/81, C12N1/19, C12Q1/44, A61K31/00, C07K15/28
Former IPC [1997/03]A61K31/00, C07H21/00, C07K15/00, C07K15/28, C12N1/19, C12N1/21, C12N5/10, C12N9/16, C12N15/55, C12Q1/44
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [1997/03]
TitleGerman:PHOSPHODIESTERASE DES MENSCHLICHEN GEHIRNS[1997/03]
English:HUMAN BRAIN PHOSPHODIESTERASE[1997/03]
French:PHOSPHODIESTERASE DU CERVEAU HUMAIN[2004/44]
Former [1997/03]PPHOSPHODIESTERASE DU CERVEAU HUMAIN
Entry into regional phase12.09.1995National basic fee paid 
12.09.1995Search fee paid 
12.09.1995Designation fee(s) paid 
12.09.1995Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.08.1994Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
12.09.1995Examination requested  [1997/03]
24.08.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.03.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.03.2000Request for accelerated examination filed
11.04.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.08.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.12.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.03.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.03.2002Date of oral proceedings
31.05.2002Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
31.05.2002Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
07.10.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.10.2004Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
14.12.2004Fee for grant paid
14.12.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Appeal following examination19.07.2002Appeal received No.  T0182/03
08.10.2002Statement of grounds filed
23.06.2004Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant
23.06.2004Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)EP02017132.8  / EP1281770
Opposition(s)22.06.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.03.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
07.03.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
05.03.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
04.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
06.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
05.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 08
04.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 09
05.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 10
04.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 11
04.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 12
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL21.09.2005
[2006/22]
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[X]WO9116457  (COLD SPRING HARBOR LAB [US]);
 [Y]US5190931  (INOUYE MASAYORI [US]);
 [X]  - R. OBERNOLTE ET AL., "The cDNA of a Human Lymphocyte Cyclic-AMP Phosphodiesterase (PDE IV) Reveals a Multigene Family", GENE, (1993), vol. 129, pages 239 - 247, XP002947900

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-1119(93)90274-7
 [XP]  - BOLGER, G. ET AL., "A Family of Human Phosphodiesterases Homologous to the Dunce Learning and Memory Gene Product of Drosophila Melanogaster are Potential Targets for Antidepressant Drugs", MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR BIOLOGY, (199310), vol. 13, no. 10, pages 6558 - 6571, XP000566626
 [XP]  - MCLAUGHLIN, M. M. ET AL, "A Low-Km, Rolipram-Sensitive, cAMP-Specific Phosphodiesterase from Human Brain", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (19930325), vol. 268, no. 9, pages 6470 - 6476, XP002961426
 [Y]  - ODELL, W.D. ET AL., Principles of competitive protein-binding assays, JOHN WILEY & SONS (N.Y.), (1983), pages 243 - 254, XP002961427
 [Y]  - P.M. MAURER ET AL., "Proteins and Polypeptides as Antigens", METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, (1980), vol. 70, pages 49 - 52, XP002961428
 [Y]  - J.R. MURPHY ET AL., "Genetic Construction, Expression and Melanoma-Selective Cytotoxicity of a Diphtheria Toxin-Related Alpha-Melanocyte-Stimulating Hormone Fusion Protein", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES USA, (198611), vol. 83, pages 8258 - 8262, XP002961429

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.83.21.8258
 [X]  - G. DENT ET AL., "Inhibition of Eosinophil Cyclic Nucleotide PDE Activity and Opsonised Zymosan-Stimulated Respiratory Burst by 'Type-IV'-Selective PDE Inhibitors", BRITIH JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY, (1991), vol. 103, pages 1339 - 1346, XP002961430
Examination   - HOUSLAY M.D. ET AL, "The multienzyme PDE4 cyclic adenosine monophosphate-specific phosphodiesterase family: intracellular targeting, regulation, and selective inhibition by compounds exerting anti-inflammatory and antidepressant actions", ADVANCES IN PHARMACOLOGY, (1998), vol. 44, pages 225 - 342, XP000926592
    - SHAKUR Y. ET AL, "Engineered deletion of the unique N-terminal domain of the cyclic AMP-specific phosphodiesterase RD1 prevents plasma membrane association and the attainment of enhanced thermostability without altering its sensitivity to inhibition by rolipram", BIOCHEM. JOURNAL, (19930615), vol. 292, pages 677 - 686
    - SWINNEN J.V. ET AL, "Attenuation of cAMP-mediated responses in MA-10 Leydig tumor cells by genetic manipulation of a cAMP-phosphodiesterase", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (19920805), vol. 266, no. 22, pages 14383 - 14389
    - GIEMBYCZ M.A., "Phosphodiesterase 4 inhibitors and the treatment of asthma", DRUGS, (200002), vol. 59, no. 2, pages 193 - 212
    - MANNING C.S. ET AL, "Suppression of human inflammatory cell function by subtype-selective PDE4 inhibitors correlates with inhibition of PDE4A and PDE4B", BRITISH JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY, (1999), vol. 128, pages 1393 - 1398
    - HUSTON E. ET AL, "Molecular cloning and transient expression in COS7 cells of a novel human PDE4B cAMP-specific phosphodiesterase, HSPDE4B3", BIOCHEMICAL JOURNAL, (1997), vol. 328, pages 549 - 558
    - NELSON D.R., "Cytochrome P450 and the individuality of species", ARCHIVES OF BIOCHEMISTRY AND BIOPHYSICS, (19990901), vol. 369, no. 1, pages 1 - 10
    - LAPIDOT M. ET AL, "Mouse-human orthology relationships in an olfactory receptor gene cluster", GENOMICS, (2001), vol. 71, doi:doi:10.1006/geno.2000.6431, pages 296 - 306, XP004432293

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/geno.2000.6431
    - DEHAL P. ET AL, "Human chromosome 19 and related regions in mouse: Conservative and lineage-specific evolution", SCIENCE, (20010706), vol. 293, no. 5527, pages 104 - 111
    - SOUNESS J.E. ET AL, "Immunosuppressive and anti-inflammatory effects of cyclic AMP phosphodiesterase (PDE) type 4 inhibitors", IMMUNOCPHARMACOLOGY, (2000), vol. 47, doi:doi:10.1016/S0162-3109(00)00185-5, pages 127 - 162, XP002325705

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0162-3109(00)00185-5
    - DONG X. ET AL, "A diverse family of GPCRs expressed in specific subsets of nociceptive sensory neurons", CELL, (20010907), vol. 106, doi:doi:10.1016/S0092-8674(01)00483-4, pages 619 - 632, XP002287771

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0092-8674(01)00483-4
    - WANG P. ET AL, "Phosphodiesterase 4B2 is the predominant phoshodiesterase species and undergoes differential regulation of gene expression in human monocytes and neutrophils", MOLECULAR PHARMACOLOGY, (1999), vol. 56, pages 170 - 174, XP001015640
    - BAILLIE G.S. ET AL, "Sub-family selective actions in the ability of Erk2 MAP kinase to phosphorylate and regulate the activiry of PDE4 cyclic AMP-specific phosphodiesterases", BRITISH JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY, (2000), vol. 131, pages 811 - 819
    - BEAVO J.A.; REIFSNYDER D.H., "Primary sequence of cyclic nucleotide phosphodiesterase isozymes and the design of selective inhibitors", TRENDS IN PHARMACOLOGICAL SCIENCES, (199004), vol. 11, doi:doi:10.1016/0165-6147(90)90066-H, pages 150 - 155, XP023855291

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0165-6147(90)90066-H
    - SWINNEN J.V. ET AL, "Properties and hormonal regulation of two structurally related cAMP phosphodiesterases from the rat sertoli cell", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (19910925), vol. 266, no. 27, pages 18370 - 18377
    - WAXMAN D.J., "P450 gene induction by structurally diverso xenochemicals: central role of nuclear receptors CAR, PXR, and PPAR", ARCHIVES OF BIOCHEMISTRY AND BIOPHYSICS, (19990901), vol. 369, no. 1, pages 11 - 23
    - LIVI G.P. ET AL, "Cloning and expression of cDNA for a human low-Km, rolipram-sensitive cyclic AMP phosphodiesterase", MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR BIOLOGY, (199006), vol. 10, no. 6, pages 2678 - 2686, XP002107018
    - COLICELLI J. ET AL, "Expression of three mammalian cDNAs that interfere with RAS function in Saccharomyces cerevisiae", GENETICS, (199104), vol. 88, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.88.7.2913, pages 2913 - 2917, XP002087363

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.88.7.2913
    - COLICELLI J. ET AL, "Isolation and characterization of a mammalian gene encoding a high-affinity cAMP phosphodiesterase", PNAS, (198905), vol. 86, no. 10, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.86.10.3599, pages 3599 - 3603, XP000026470

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.86.10.3599
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.