|
09.01.2009 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.2008 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.2008 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.2008 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.11.2008 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.02.2008 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.07.2007 |
Non-scannable object |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.2007 |
Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.2007 |
Sequence listing |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.07.2007 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.07.2007 |
Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.07.2007 |
Sequence listing |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.06.2007 |
Deficiencies in sequence listing |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.09.2006 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2006 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.09.2006 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.09.2006 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
07.06.2006 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.06.2006 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.06.2006 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
41 |
|
28.03.2006 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
28.03.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2006 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
27.03.2006 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.03.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.2005 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.2005 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
13 |
|
16.06.2005 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
7 |
|
12.05.2005 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
12.05.2005 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
12.05.2005 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
12.05.2005 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
12.05.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
12.05.2005 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
12.05.2005 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
36 |
|
10.05.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
67 |
|
15.04.2005 |
Communication of amended entries |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.04.2005 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.04.2005 |
Request for change of representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.04.2005 |
Request for change of representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.03.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.03.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.03.2005 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
8 |
|
28.02.2005 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.12.2004 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.12.2004 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.11.2004 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.08.2004 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.08.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.08.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.08.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.08.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.08.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.08.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.08.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.08.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.08.2004 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
17 |
|
07.08.2004 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
15 |
|
07.08.2004 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
37 |
|
07.08.2004 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.08.2004 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
40 |
|
07.08.2004 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
07.08.2004 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.08.2004 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
12 |
|
06.08.2004 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
160 |
|
28.06.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.06.2004 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.05.2004 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.04.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.04.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.03.2004 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.03.2004 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.03.2004 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
30.03.2004 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.03.2004 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.2004 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2004 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.03.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.03.2004 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2004 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.02.2004 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.02.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.02.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.02.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.02.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
04.02.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
04.02.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.02.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
04.02.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
04.02.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
04.02.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
04.02.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.02.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.02.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.02.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
04.02.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
04.02.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
04.02.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
04.02.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
04.02.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
04.02.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.02.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
04.02.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
04.02.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
04.02.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
04.02.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
04.02.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.02.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
04.02.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.02.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
04.02.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
04.02.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
04.02.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
04.02.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
04.02.2004 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
57 |
|
04.02.2004 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
53 |
|
12.11.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.11.2003 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.2003 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.02.2003 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.02.2003 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.2002 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.2002 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.10.2002 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.07.2002 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2002 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2002 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.2002 |
Request for change of address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.04.2002 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.04.2002 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.04.2002 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.12.2001 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.12.2001 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.08.2001 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
11.08.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.08.2001 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
11.08.2001 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
07.08.2001 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
40 |
|
31.05.2001 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.05.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.05.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.02.2001 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
06.11.2000 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.02.1999 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.1999 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.01.1999 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.1997 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.12.1997 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.11.1997 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.09.1997 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
21.04.1997 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.01.1997 |
Letter filed before dispatch of the 1st communication from the Examining Division(examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.12.1996 |
Letter filed before dispatch of the 1st communication from the Examining Division(examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.1996 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.11.1996 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.11.1996 |
Partial European search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.07.1996 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.05.1996 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.11.1995 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.1995 |
Letter concerning biological material |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.10.1995 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.1995 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
05.10.1995 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
05.10.1995 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
11.05.1995 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.11.1994 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.10.1994 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.10.1994 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
52 |
|
27.10.1994 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
37 |