EP0656861 - WRAP-AROUND CARRIER WITH FLEXIBLE HEEL APERTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.1999 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RIVERWOOD INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION 3350 Cumberland Circle, Suite 1600 Atlanta Georgia 30339 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/24] | For all designated states RIVERWOOD INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION 3350 Cumberland Circle, Suite 1600 Atlanta, Georgia 30339 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUTHERLAND, Robert, L. 4929 Pembridge Lane Kennesaw, GA 30144 / US | [1995/24] | Representative(s) | Grättinger Möhring von Poschinger Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 16 55 82306 Starnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/24] | Grättinger & Partner Postfach 16 55 D-82306 Starnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 94920780.7 | 20.06.1994 | [1995/24] | WO1994US06966 | Priority number, date | US19930083128 | 24.06.1993 Original published format: US 83128 | [1995/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9500412 | Date: | 05.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0656861 | Date: | 14.06.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.01.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0656861 | Date: | 28.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.01.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B65D75/06 | [1995/24] | CPC: |
B65D71/20 (EP,US);
B65D75/06 (KR);
B65D2571/0016 (EP,US);
B65D2571/00172 (EP,US);
B65D2571/00277 (EP,US);
B65D2571/0029 (EP,US);
B65D2571/00444 (EP,US);
B65D2571/00543 (EP,US);
B65D2571/0066 (EP,US);
B65D2571/00716 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/24] | Title | German: | UMHÜLLENDER VERPACKUNGSTRÄGER MIT FLEXIBLEN ÖFFNUNGEN IN DEN SEITENWÄNDEN | [1995/24] | English: | WRAP-AROUND CARRIER WITH FLEXIBLE HEEL APERTURE | [1995/24] | French: | SUPPORT ENVELOPPANT A OUVERTURE FLEXIBLE POUR LE FOND DES BOUTEILLES | [1995/24] | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.1995 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.1995 | Search fee paid | 16.03.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.06.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.1995 | Examination requested [1995/34] | 30.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.08.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 19.12.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.04.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.10.1998 | CH | 28.10.1998 | GR | 28.10.1998 | LI | 28.10.1998 | DK | 28.01.1999 | SE | 28.01.1999 | LU | 20.06.1999 | [2004/39] |
Former [2003/45] | AT | 28.10.1998 | |
CH | 28.10.1998 | ||
GR | 28.10.1998 | ||
LI | 28.10.1998 | ||
DK | 28.01.1999 | ||
SE | 28.01.1999 | ||
Former [2003/17] | AT | 28.10.1998 | |
CH | 28.10.1998 | ||
GR | 28.10.1998 | ||
LI | 28.10.1998 | ||
SE | 28.01.1999 | ||
MC | 30.06.1999 | ||
Former [2001/23] | AT | 28.10.1998 | |
CH | 28.10.1998 | ||
GR | 28.10.1998 | ||
LI | 28.10.1998 | ||
SE | 28.01.1999 | ||
Former [1999/34] | AT | 28.10.1998 | |
CH | 28.10.1998 | ||
LI | 28.10.1998 | ||
SE | 28.01.1999 | ||
Former [1999/32] | CH | 28.10.1998 | |
LI | 28.10.1998 | ||
SE | 28.01.1999 | ||
Former [1999/22] | CH | 28.10.1998 | |
LI | 28.10.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4373630 (OLIFF JAMES R) [X] 1,11,17,21,25* figures 1,2,4 * | International search | [XY]US3278075 (WEISS ARTHUR J); | [Y]US3355012 (WEISS ARTHUR J); | [A]US3462011 (FARQUHAR MELVILLE T) |