EP0717863 - OPTICAL FIBRE ORGANIZER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.09.2000 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.09.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.11.2000 [2000/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states N.V. RAYCHEM S.A. Diestsesteenweg 692 3010 Kessel-Lo / BE | [1999/46] |
Former [1996/26] | For all designated states N.V. RAYCHEM S.A. Diestsesteenweg 692 B-3010 Kessel-Lo / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MACKEN, Luk, Jozef van Schoonbekestraat 77 B-2018 Antwerpen / BE | 02 /
VAN NOTEN, Lodewijk, Cordula, Michael Oude Rondelaan 96 B-3000 Leuven / BE | [1996/26] | Representative(s) | Clayton-Hathway, Anthony Nicholas, et al Raychem Limited Intellectual Property Law Department Faraday Road Dorcan, Swindon Wiltshire SN3 5HH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/26] | Clayton, Anthony Nicholas, et al Raychem Limited Intellectual Property Law Dept. Faraday Road Dorcan Swindon, Wiltshire SN3 5HH / GB | Application number, filing date | 94925538.4 | 02.09.1994 | [1996/26] | WO1994GB01911 | Priority number, date | GB19930018654 | 08.09.1993 Original published format: GB 9318654 | [1996/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9507484 | Date: | 16.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0717863 | Date: | 26.06.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.03.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0717863 | Date: | 17.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/44 | [1996/26] | CPC: |
G02B6/4453 (EP,US);
G02B6/46 (KR);
G02B6/4442 (EP,US);
G02B6/4452 (EP,US);
G02B6/4476 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1996/26] | Title | German: | FASERAUFTEILUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [1996/26] | English: | OPTICAL FIBRE ORGANIZER | [1996/26] | French: | PLATINE D'ASSEMBLAGE DE FIBRES OPTIQUES | [1996/26] | Entry into regional phase | 20.02.1996 | National basic fee paid | 20.02.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.02.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.11.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.02.1996 | Examination requested [1996/26] | 27.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 03.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 14.04.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.08.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]US4627686 (SZENTESI OTTO I [US]) [AD] 1 * column L; figure -; claim - *; | [A]US4793682 (COOPER DAVID A [US]) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [AD]US4840449 (GHANDEHARIZADEH SHAHRYAR [US]) [AD] 1* figure -; claim - *; | [A]WO9012334 (BRITISH TELECOMM [GB]) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]WO9110927 (PORTA SYSTEMS CORP [US]) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [XP]EP0593927 (SEL ALCATEL AG [DE]) [XP] 1-6,8,9,12,14 * paragraph [000A]; figure -; claim - * |