EP0761796 - WORKING MIXTURE FOR REFRIGERATION MACHINERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.02.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Joint Stock Company "INERTEK" pl. Kurchatova, 1 Moscow 123182 / RU | [2002/10] |
Former [1997/11] | For all designated states SOVMESTNOE PREDPRIYATIE "INERTEK" pl. Kurchatova, 1 Moscow 123182 / RU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARABANOV, Valery Georgievich ul. Dimitrova, 4-1-408 S. Petersburg, 192239 / RU | 02 /
BELYAEV, Andrei Jurievich 3-Mikhalkovsky pr., 20-3-55 Moscow, 125239 / RU | 03 /
EGOROV, Sergei Dmitrievich pr. Shokalskogo, 61-1-98 Moscow, 129224 / RU | 04 /
KONDRATIEV, Jury Roaldovich pr. Melnikova, 10-85 Khimki-Moskovskaya obl., 129224 / RU | 05 /
KOROTEEV, Anatoly Sazonovich Ivovaya ul., 7-28 Moscow, 129329 / RU | 06 /
PONOMAREV-STEPNOI, Nikolai Nikolaevich ul. Maximova, 8-16 Moscow, 123098 / RU | 07 /
RUVINSKY, Genrikh Yakovlevich ul. Yakira, 17-87 Odessa, 270076 / UA | 08 /
KHMELNUK, Michail Georgievich ul. Leningradskaya, 31-1 Odessa, 270008 / UA | 09 /
CHIKUROV, Sergei Konstantinovich Petrovsko-Razumovsky pr., 5-74 Moscow, 125083 / RU | [1997/11] | Representative(s) | Rambelli, Paolo, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1997/11] | Rambelli, Paolo, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Corso Regio Parco, 27 10152 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 94925653.1 | 15.08.1994 | [1997/11] | WO1994RU00191 | Priority number, date | RU19940015395 | 27.04.1994 Original published format: RU 94015395 | [1997/11] | Filing language | RU | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9529210 | Date: | 02.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0761796 | Date: | 12.03.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.11.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0761796 | Date: | 17.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 02.11.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C09K5/04 | [1997/11] | CPC: |
C09K5/045 (EP);
C09K2205/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1997/11] | Title | German: | ARBEITSMISCHUNG FÜR KÜHLANLAGEN | [1997/11] | English: | WORKING MIXTURE FOR REFRIGERATION MACHINERY | [1997/11] | French: | MELANGE DE FONCTIONNEMENT POUR EQUIPEMENT DE REFRIGERATION | [1997/11] | Entry into regional phase | 25.11.1996 | Translation filed | 15.11.1996 | National basic fee paid | 15.11.1996 | Search fee paid | 15.11.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.11.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: RU | 25.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/11] | 07.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.10.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.09.1999 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   20.09.1999 | 31.08.2000 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   13.02.2001 | 01.09.2001 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   19.09.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 17.04.2002 | IT | 17.04.2002 | DE | 18.07.2002 | ES | 30.10.2002 | [2008/05] |
Former [2006/14] | FR | 17.04.2002 | |
DE | 18.07.2002 | ||
ES | 30.10.2002 | ||
Former [2004/04] | DE | 18.07.2002 | |
ES | 30.10.2002 | ||
FR | 10.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/47] | DE | 18.07.2002 | |
FR | 10.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/31] | DE | 18.07.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH01139677 ; | [Y]JPH01139677 | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 89, no. 28, Database accession no. 89-202052, XP002027366 & JPH01139677 A 00000000 (ASAHI GLASS) [Y] 1-3 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 013, no. 394, Database accession no. (C - 631), & JP01139677 A 00000000 (ASAHI GLASS) [Y] 1-3 * abstract * | International search | [A]SU1090699 ; | [A]GB2247462 ; | [A]GB2228739 ; | [A]EP0381389 ; | [A]WO9315161 |