|
10.11.2008 |
Processing of grant of a patent after appeal (internal) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2008 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.03.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.03.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.03.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.03.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.03.2008 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
11 |
|
27.03.2008 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
23 |
|
22.01.2008 |
Title page: Decision (inter partes / revocation of patent) |
Appeal |
21 |
|
21.01.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.01.2008 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.01.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.12.2007 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.12.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.12.2007 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
24 |
|
20.12.2007 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
24 |
|
27.09.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.09.2007 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
9 |
|
03.09.2007 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.08.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.08.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.08.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.08.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.08.2007 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.08.2007 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.08.2007 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.06.2007 |
F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.09.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.08.2006 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
53 |
|
18.08.2006 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.05.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.05.2006 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.04.2006 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.04.2006 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
28 |
|
24.04.2006 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
21.04.2006 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
35 |
|
29.03.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.03.2006 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.02.2006 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.02.2006 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.02.2006 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.12.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
7 |
|
16.12.2005 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.2005 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
17 |
|
16.12.2005 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.2005 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.2005 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.2005 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.2005 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.12.2005 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
21.11.2005 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2005 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.2005 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.11.2005 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.10.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.10.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.10.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.10.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.10.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.10.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
36 |
|
21.10.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
38 |
|
21.10.2005 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
99 |
|
21.10.2005 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
13 |
|
17.08.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2005 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2005 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.07.2005 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.07.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.07.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.07.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.07.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
7 |
|
11.07.2005 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.2005 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.2005 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.07.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.06.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
17 |
|
14.06.2005 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.03.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.03.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
01.03.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.02.2005 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.10.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
27.05.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.05.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.05.2004 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.02.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.2004 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.01.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.01.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.01.2004 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.01.2004 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.01.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
11 |
|
21.08.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.2003 |
Annex |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.08.2003 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.08.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
05.08.2003 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
27.05.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.05.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.05.2003 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.05.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.03.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.03.2003 |
|
Opposition |
4 |
|
25.03.2003 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.03.2003 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.03.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.03.2003 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.03.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.2003 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.2003 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.2003 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2002 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
20.12.2002 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
20.12.2002 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
20 |
|
20.12.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
20.12.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
20.12.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
20.12.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
20.12.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
07.02.2002 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.01.2002 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2002 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.11.2001 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2001 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.11.2001 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.09.2001 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.08.2001 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.08.2001 |
Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.08.2001 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.06.2001 |
Grant of extension of time limit |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.02.2001 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.02.2001 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.02.2001 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
11.07.2000 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.07.2000 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.07.2000 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.03.2000 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.01.2000 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
24.01.2000 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.01.2000 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
24.01.2000 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.1999 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.1999 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.1999 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.06.1999 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
25.06.1999 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
25.06.1999 |
Description |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
25.06.1999 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
25.06.1999 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.04.1999 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.1999 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.02.1999 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.1998 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.11.1998 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.1996 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.1996 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.03.1996 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.02.1996 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.02.1996 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.11.1995 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.1995 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.1995 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.04.1995 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.04.1995 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.12.1994 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.10.1994 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.10.1994 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
46 |
|
27.10.1994 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
42 |