|
11.09.2008 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.09.2008 |
Communication to the parties concerning termination of the opposition proceedings - opposition rejected - no appeal lodged |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.09.2008 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.07.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.07.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.07.2008 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
22 |
|
20.12.2007 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.12.2007 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.12.2007 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.11.2007 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.11.2007 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
28.11.2007 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.11.2007 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
16.11.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.11.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.11.2007 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.11.2007 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.11.2007 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
12.11.2007 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
25.10.2007 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.10.2007 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
12 |
|
10.04.2007 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.03.2007 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.03.2007 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
4 |
|
16.03.2007 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.12.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.11.2006 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.08.2006 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
03.08.2006 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.07.2006 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
19.07.2006 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2006 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.06.2006 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.06.2006 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.06.2006 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.05.2006 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.05.2006 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.05.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.05.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.04.2006 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.03.2006 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.03.2006 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
6 |
|
30.03.2006 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.03.2006 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.03.2006 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.03.2006 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
30.03.2006 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.03.2006 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.03.2006 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.03.2006 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.03.2006 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.03.2006 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.03.2006 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
13.02.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.02.2006 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
08.02.2006 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
15 |
|
25.07.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.2005 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
15.07.2005 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.2005 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.06.2005 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.06.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.06.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.06.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.06.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
90 |
|
16.06.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.03.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.2004 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.03.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.2003 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.2003 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.12.2003 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.12.2003 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.2003 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.12.2003 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.12.2003 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.12.2003 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.12.2003 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.10.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.10.2003 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.09.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.05.2003 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.05.2003 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.2003 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.05.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.05.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
05.05.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
88 |
|
05.05.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
05.05.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
05.05.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
46 |
|
05.05.2003 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
05.05.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
82 |
|
05.05.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
51 |
|
05.05.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
24.04.2003 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
13.06.2002 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.02.2002 |
Letter concerning the printing fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.2002 |
Sequence listing |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.02.2002 |
Sequence listing |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.01.2002 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.01.2002 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2002 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2002 |
Sequence listing |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.01.2002 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.11.2001 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2001 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.11.2001 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.2001 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.09.2001 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.2001 |
Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.2001 |
Grant of extension of time limit |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit to announcement of intention to grant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2001 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.02.2001 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.02.2001 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
37 |
|
15.01.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.01.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.01.2001 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.09.2000 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.09.2000 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.03.2000 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.2000 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.1999 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.03.1999 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.1999 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.1999 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.09.1998 |
Communication of expected date of establishment of search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.1998 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.1998 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.03.1997 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.1996 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.1996 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.07.1996 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.07.1996 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
46 |
|
03.07.1996 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.07.1996 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.1996 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.1996 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.04.1996 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.04.1996 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.04.1996 |
Description |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
15.04.1996 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.04.1996 |
Letter concerning biological material |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.04.1996 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.04.1996 |
Sequence listing |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.08.1995 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.08.1995 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.06.1995 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.04.1995 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.04.1995 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
40 |
|
20.04.1995 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
48 |