|
28.10.2003 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
28 |
|
07.08.2003 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
13 |
|
28.05.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.05.2003 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.05.2003 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.05.2003 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.05.2003 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.05.2003 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.05.2003 |
Description |
Appeal |
3 |
|
21.05.2003 |
Description |
Appeal |
3 |
|
21.05.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
23.04.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.04.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
14.04.2003 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
52 |
|
04.03.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.03.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.02.2003 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
6 |
|
24.02.2003 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.12.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.11.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
19.06.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.06.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
19.04.2002 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.04.2002 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.04.2002 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.12.2001 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.12.2001 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
07.12.2001 |
Description |
Appeal |
5 |
|
07.12.2001 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
04.12.2001 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
15 |
|
12.10.2001 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.10.2001 |
Composition of the board (only boards 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.10.2001 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.10.2001 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.09.2001 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
22.09.2001 |
Description |
Appeal |
12 |
|
22.09.2001 |
Drawings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.09.2001 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
22.09.2001 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
22.09.2001 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
22.09.2001 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.09.2001 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
38 |
|
31.07.2001 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.07.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.07.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.07.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.07.2001 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
25.07.2001 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
5 |
|
25.07.2001 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.07.2001 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.07.2001 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
25.07.2001 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.06.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.05.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.05.2001 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.05.2001 |
Description |
Opposition |
6 |
|
29.05.2001 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.05.2001 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
13 |
|
19.01.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.01.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.01.2001 |
General authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.01.2001 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.01.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.01.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.01.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.01.2001 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.01.2001 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.01.2001 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.01.2001 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2000 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.07.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.06.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
16.05.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.05.2000 |
Communication of amended entries |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.03.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.02.2000 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
29.02.2000 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.02.2000 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
26.01.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.01.2000 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.12.1999 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.1999 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.08.1999 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.08.1999 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.07.1999 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.07.1999 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
08.12.1998 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.11.1998 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
27.08.1998 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.08.1998 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.1998 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.1998 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.07.1998 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.04.1998 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.02.1998 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.1998 |
Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.1997 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.11.1997 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
24.10.1997 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.05.1997 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.05.1997 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.07.1996 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.1996 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.1996 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.07.1995 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.05.1995 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.05.1995 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
11.05.1995 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
18 |