|
05.11.2015 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.07.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.07.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.07.2015 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
33 |
|
03.07.2015 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.06.2015 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
8 |
|
02.06.2015 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.06.2015 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.05.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.05.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.05.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.05.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.05.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.05.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.05.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.05.2015 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.05.2015 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
08.05.2015 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.05.2015 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.05.2015 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.03.2015 |
Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.03.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.03.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.03.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.03.2015 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.03.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.03.2015 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.02.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.02.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.02.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.02.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.02.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.02.2015 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.02.2015 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.02.2015 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.02.2015 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.01.2015 |
Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.01.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.01.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.01.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.01.2015 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.01.2015 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.01.2015 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
14 |
|
07.01.2015 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.04.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.02.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.02.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.02.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.02.2014 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.02.2014 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Appeal |
38 |
|
07.02.2014 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.06.2013 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.04.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.04.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
18.04.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.04.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.04.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.04.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.04.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.04.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.04.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.04.2012 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
13 |
|
16.04.2012 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
21 |
|
09.03.2012 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
16.01.2012 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.2011 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
124 |
|
08.12.2011 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
02.12.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.12.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.12.2011 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
02.12.2011 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
02.12.2011 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
02.12.2011 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
02.12.2011 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
02.12.2011 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
24 |
|
02.12.2011 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
60 |
|
02.12.2011 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
60 |
|
02.12.2011 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
24 |
|
02.12.2011 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
21 |
|
14.10.2011 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
30.09.2011 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.09.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.08.2011 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.08.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.08.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.07.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2011 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
23 |
|
26.07.2011 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
13 |
|
22.06.2011 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.05.2011 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.04.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.04.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.04.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2011 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2011 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.04.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.03.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.03.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.03.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.03.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.03.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.03.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.12.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.12.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.12.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.11.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.11.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
10 |
|
22.11.2010 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.07.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
19 |
|
14.07.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.07.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.07.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.07.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.07.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.07.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.07.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
10 |
|
12.07.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
12.07.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
12.07.2010 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
19 |
|
12.07.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
12.07.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
12.07.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
05.07.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.07.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.07.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.07.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
05.07.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
05.07.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
05.07.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
02.07.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.07.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
02.07.2010 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
02.03.2010 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.03.2010 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.03.2010 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.06.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.06.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.06.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.06.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.06.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.2009 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.06.2009 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
23 |
|
22.12.2008 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
7 |
|
15.12.2008 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
64 |
|
15.12.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.12.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
6 |
|
12.12.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
12.12.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.12.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
62 |
|
12.12.2008 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
38 |
|
11.12.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.12.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.12.2008 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.12.2008 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.12.2008 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
38 |
|
04.12.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
6 |
|
04.12.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.12.2008 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.11.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
20.11.2008 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
20.11.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
20.11.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
29 |
|
20.11.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
19.11.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.11.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
12 |
|
17.11.2008 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
17.11.2008 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
17.11.2008 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
29 |
|
17.11.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
14.11.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
17 |
|
14.11.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
15 |
|
14.11.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
15 |
|
14.11.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
14.11.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
20.09.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.09.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.09.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.09.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.09.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.09.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.09.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.06.2007 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.06.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
26.06.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
14.06.2007 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.06.2007 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
08.06.2007 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
05.02.2007 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.01.2007 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
10 |
|
23.01.2007 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
10 |
|
11.01.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
05.01.2007 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.12.2006 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
22.09.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.09.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.09.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.09.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.09.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.09.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.09.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.09.2006 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
11 |
|
08.05.2006 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.05.2006 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.2006 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.2006 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.2006 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.2006 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.04.2006 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.03.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.03.2006 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.03.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.03.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.02.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.02.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.02.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.02.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.02.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.02.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.01.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.01.2006 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.2006 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.2006 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.01.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
8 |
|
30.01.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
11 |
|
30.01.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
30.01.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.01.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.01.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
60 |
|
27.01.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
26 |
|
27.01.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
8 |
|
19.01.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.09.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.08.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.08.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.2005 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.2005 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.2005 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.2005 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.07.2005 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.07.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.07.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.07.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.07.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.06.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.06.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.06.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.06.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.06.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.06.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.06.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.06.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.06.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.06.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.06.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.04.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.04.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.04.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.04.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.04.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.04.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.2005 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.04.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.04.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.04.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.04.2005 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.04.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.04.2005 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.04.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.04.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.04.2005 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.04.2005 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
05.04.2005 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.04.2005 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.04.2005 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.12.2002 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.12.2002 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.12.2002 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.12.2002 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.12.2002 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.12.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
27 |
|
27.12.2002 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.12.2002 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.12.2002 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.12.2002 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.12.2002 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.12.2002 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
27.12.2002 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.12.2002 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.12.2002 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.12.2002 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
27.12.2002 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
25 |
|
20.12.2002 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2002 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2002 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
27 |
|
02.12.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.2002 |
Refusal of request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.2002 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.10.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.10.2002 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.07.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.07.2002 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.07.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.06.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.06.2002 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.05.2002 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.03.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.2002 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.2002 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.2002 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.01.2002 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.01.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.01.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.11.2001 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.11.2001 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.11.2001 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.2001 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.2001 |
Description |
Opposition |
4 |
|
11.10.2001 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
11.10.2001 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.10.2001 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.10.2001 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
08.10.2001 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
08.10.2001 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
08.10.2001 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
08.10.2001 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.10.2001 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
08.10.2001 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
08.10.2001 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.10.2001 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
08.10.2001 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
08.10.2001 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
08.10.2001 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
81 |
|
08.10.2001 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
35 |
|
08.10.2001 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
48 |
|
08.10.2001 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
62 |
|
02.10.2001 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
02.10.2001 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
02.10.2001 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.10.2001 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.10.2001 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.10.2001 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
02.10.2001 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
20 |
|
02.10.2001 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.10.2001 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
98 |
|
02.10.2001 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
54 |
|
02.10.2001 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
40 |
|
25.09.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.2001 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.2001 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.11.2000 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.11.2000 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.2000 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.11.2000 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.2000 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.10.2000 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.10.2000 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.2000 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.10.2000 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.10.2000 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (translations of claims/payment missing) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.2000 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.2000 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.2000 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.10.2000 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.04.2000 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.01.2000 |
Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.1999 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.1999 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.11.1999 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.1999 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.1999 |
Decision to refuse (Formalities Officer) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.1999 |
Grant of extension of time limit |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.1999 |
Request for extension of time limit to announcement of intention to grant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.1999 |
Request for extension of time limit to announcement of intention to grant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.03.1999 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.1999 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.1999 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.02.1999 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.02.1999 |
Description |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
10.02.1999 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.1999 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
86 |
|
05.02.1999 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
25.11.1998 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.11.1998 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.1998 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.1998 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.10.1998 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.10.1998 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.08.1998 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.06.1998 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.1998 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.05.1998 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.03.1998 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.11.1997 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.10.1997 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.12.1996 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.1996 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.1996 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.1996 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.05.1996 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.05.1996 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.05.1996 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.05.1996 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
24.05.1996 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.05.1996 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.05.1996 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
04.05.1996 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.01.1996 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.01.1996 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.07.1995 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.06.1995 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.1995 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
58 |
|
04.05.1995 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
108 |