|
13.04.2016 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.07.2013 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.08.2008 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.04.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.04.2008 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
67 |
|
27.02.2008 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
4 |
|
24.01.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.2008 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.2008 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
23.01.2008 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.01.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
21.01.2008 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
24.09.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.09.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.09.2007 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
7 |
|
21.07.2006 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.2006 |
Communication of amended entries |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.07.2006 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.07.2006 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.07.2006 |
Request for change of representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.01.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.01.2006 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.01.2006 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
16.01.2006 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
11.01.2006 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.01.2006 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.01.2006 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
11.01.2006 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
11.01.2006 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
11.01.2006 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.01.2006 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.01.2006 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
44 |
|
15.11.2005 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.11.2005 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.11.2005 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.06.2005 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.06.2005 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
29.04.2005 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.04.2005 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.04.2005 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.04.2005 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.02.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.02.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.2005 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
13 |
|
18.02.2005 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
14 |
|
18.02.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
6 |
|
18.02.2005 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.2005 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
10 |
|
18.02.2005 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
24 |
|
18.02.2005 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.02.2005 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.2005 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.2005 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.11.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.11.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.11.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
22.11.2004 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
6 |
|
19.11.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
19.11.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
19.11.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
19.11.2004 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
18.06.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.06.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.06.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.06.2004 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.06.2004 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.06.2004 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.05.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.04.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
13 |
|
30.04.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
05.03.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2004 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.02.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.01.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.01.2004 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.10.2003 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.10.2003 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.09.2003 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.09.2003 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.08.2003 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.08.2003 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.07.2003 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.07.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
15.07.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
15.07.2003 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
15.07.2003 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
15 |
|
15.07.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
15.07.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
15.07.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
27 |
|
15.07.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
26 |
|
15.07.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
30 |
|
15.07.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
59 |
|
05.09.2002 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.07.2002 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.07.2002 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.07.2002 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.07.2002 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.07.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.07.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.07.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.07.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.07.2002 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.2002 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.2002 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.2002 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.04.2002 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.04.2002 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.04.2002 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2002 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2002 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.02.2002 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.02.2002 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
12.12.2001 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.10.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.10.2001 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.10.2001 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.08.2001 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.07.2001 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.07.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.04.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.04.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.03.2001 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.2001 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.2001 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.03.2001 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.03.2001 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.03.2001 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.03.2001 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.03.2001 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.02.2001 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.2001 |
Transmittal of third party observations to applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.2001 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.02.2001 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.01.2001 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.01.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.12.2000 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.12.2000 |
Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.12.2000 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.09.2000 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.09.2000 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
12.02.2000 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.12.1999 |
Description |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
27.12.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.12.1999 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.12.1999 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
20.10.1999 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.10.1999 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.1995 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.06.1995 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.06.1995 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.06.1995 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.06.1995 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.1995 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.05.1995 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.1995 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.1995 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.04.1995 |
Refund order search fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.1995 |
Refund order search fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.03.1995 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.03.1995 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.02.1995 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.1995 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.02.1995 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.02.1995 |
Description |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
10.02.1995 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.1995 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.02.1995 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
23.11.1993 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
29.12.1992 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
23.12.1992 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.12.1992 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
23.12.1992 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
27 |