|
31.05.2016 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2008 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.12.2008 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.2008 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.2008 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.11.2008 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.2008 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.11.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.11.2008 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.2008 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.09.2008 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.09.2008 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.09.2008 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.09.2008 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
9 |
|
18.09.2008 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.09.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.09.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.09.2008 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.08.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.07.2008 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
18 |
|
01.07.2008 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.06.2008 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
10 |
|
03.06.2008 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.06.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.05.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.05.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.05.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.03.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.03.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.03.2008 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
7 |
|
10.03.2008 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
4 |
|
06.03.2008 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.08.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.08.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.07.2006 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.07.2006 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.04.2006 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.04.2006 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
30 |
|
03.04.2006 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
31 |
|
17.02.2006 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.02.2006 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.02.2006 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.02.2006 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.02.2006 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.02.2006 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
02.12.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.2005 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
12 |
|
22.11.2005 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.11.2005 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
22.11.2005 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.11.2005 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.2005 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.2005 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.11.2005 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.2005 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.2005 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
8 |
|
07.11.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.2005 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.11.2005 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
19.10.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.10.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
14.10.2005 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
14.10.2005 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.10.2005 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.10.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
11.10.2005 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.10.2005 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
15.07.2005 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.07.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.07.2005 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.07.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.07.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.07.2005 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.07.2005 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.06.2005 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.04.2005 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.11.2004 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.11.2004 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
18 |
|
12.11.2004 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
6 |
|
02.11.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
29.10.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.10.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
19.10.2004 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.10.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.10.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.10.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.10.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.10.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
19.05.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.05.2004 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.05.2004 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.09.2002 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.09.2002 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.09.2002 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.09.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.09.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.09.2002 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.08.2002 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
23 |
|
29.08.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.08.2002 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.08.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.07.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.07.2002 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
6 |
|
03.07.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.07.2002 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.07.2002 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.07.2002 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
03.07.2002 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.07.2002 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.05.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.05.2002 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.05.2002 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
30.04.2002 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.2002 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.2002 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
11.02.2002 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.2002 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.02.2002 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.04.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.04.2001 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
17 |
|
12.04.2001 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
17 |
|
21.02.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.2001 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.10.2000 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.10.2000 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.08.2000 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.08.2000 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
25.08.2000 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
15 |
|
25.08.2000 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
25.08.2000 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
25.08.2000 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
25.08.2000 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
25.08.2000 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
25.08.2000 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.08.2000 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.08.2000 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
16 |
|
14.10.1999 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.1999 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.1999 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.07.1999 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.06.1999 |
Approval of request for amendments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.1999 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.1999 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.04.1999 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.04.1999 |
Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.03.1999 |
Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.03.1999 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.03.1999 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
08.03.1999 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.06.1998 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.06.1998 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.06.1998 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.04.1998 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.1997 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.07.1997 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.1997 |
Transmittal of third party observations to applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.06.1997 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.06.1997 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.06.1997 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.05.1997 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.05.1996 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.1996 |
Transmittal of third party observations to applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.1996 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
05.03.1996 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.03.1996 |
Patent document filed by a Third party |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.03.1996 |
Patent document filed by a Third party |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
05.03.1996 |
Patent document filed by a Third party |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
24.07.1995 |
Refund order search fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.07.1995 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.07.1995 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.05.1995 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.05.1995 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.05.1995 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.03.1995 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.03.1995 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
16.03.1995 |
Deficiencies in application documents |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.02.1995 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.02.1995 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.02.1995 |
Description |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
13.02.1995 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.02.1995 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.02.1995 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
13.02.1995 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
13.02.1995 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |