EP0671524 - Florentine blind [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.02.1999 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.02.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.03.1999 [1999/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Technolizenz Establishment Letzanaweg 25-27 9495 Triesen / LI | [N/P] |
Former [1995/37] | For all designated states Technolizenz Establishment Letzanaweg 25-27 FL-9495 Triesen / LI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | [1995/37] | Representative(s) | Rosenich, Paul, et al Patentbüro Büchel & Partner AG, Letzanaweg 25-27 9495 Triesen / LI | [N/P] |
Former [1995/44] | Rosenich, Paul, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentbüro Büchel & Partner AG, Letzanaweg 25-27 FL-9495 Triesen / LI | ||
Former [1995/37] | Rosenich, Paul, Dipl.-Ing. Patentbüro Büchel & Partner AG Letzanaweg 25-27 FL-9495 Triesen / LI | Application number, filing date | 95103394.3 | 09.03.1995 | [1995/37] | Priority number, date | CH19940000700 | 09.03.1994 Original published format: CH 70094 | [1995/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0671524 | Date: | 13.09.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.1995 | Classification | IPC: | E04F10/06 | [1995/37] | CPC: |
E04F10/0662 (EP);
E04F10/0618 (EP);
E04F10/0674 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1995/37] | Extension states | SI | 10.04.1995 | Title | German: | Markise | [1995/37] | English: | Florentine blind | [1995/37] | French: | Marquise | [1995/37] | Examination procedure | 11.03.1996 | Examination requested [1996/19] | 23.04.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/12] | 13.10.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1999/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1998 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0576829 (MHZ SONNENSCHUTZTECHNIK) [A] 1,6,7 * column 2, line 45 - column 8, line 58; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5232036 (BRUTSAERT) [A] 1-6 * figure 5 *; | [DA]EP0500030 (SCAFFIDI) [DA] 1,6,7 * column 2, line 48 - column 4, line 50; figures 1-4 *; | [DA]WO9214009 (LOHAUSEN) [DA] 1,6,8 * page 2, line 22 - page 7, line 25; figures 1,2 * |