EP0672929 - Device for controlling a zoom lens [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.03.2004 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.05.2004 [2004/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/38] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mori, Shigeru c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1995/38] | Representative(s) | Körber, Wolfhart, et al Mitscherlich & Partner Patentanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/38] | Körber, Wolfhart, Dr. rer.nat., et al Patentanwälte Mitscherlich & Partner, Sonnenstrasse 33 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95103669.8 | 14.03.1995 | [1995/38] | Priority number, date | JP19940042719 | 14.03.1994 Original published format: JP 4271994 | [1995/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0672929 | Date: | 20.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0672929 | Date: | 14.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G02B15/14 | [1995/38] | CPC: |
G02B15/144 (EP,US);
G02B15/14 (KR);
G02B13/009 (KR);
G03B17/12 (KR);
H04N23/55 (KR);
G02B2003/0093 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [1995/38] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Einstellen einer Zoomlinse | [1995/38] | English: | Device for controlling a zoom lens | [1995/38] | French: | Dispositif de commande d'une lentille zoom | [1995/38] | Examination procedure | 21.02.1996 | Examination requested [1996/17] | 12.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS60133411 ; | [X]GB2141260 (BARR & STROUD LTD) [X] 1,2 * abstract *; | [A]DE3807753 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [XA]EP0294005 (TRT TELECOM RADIO ELECTR [FR], et al) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * page 4, line 12 - line 31 * [A] 4,5 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19851122), vol. 009, no. 296, Database accession no. (P - 407), & JP60133411 A 19850716 (MITSUBISHI DENKI KK) [A] 1 * abstract * |