|
21.01.2015 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.2003 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.2003 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.06.2003 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.06.2003 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.06.2003 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.06.2003 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.06.2003 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.06.2003 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.04.2003 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.04.2003 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.03.2003 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
14 |
|
03.03.2003 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
4 |
|
18.02.2003 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
12 |
|
18.02.2003 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.01.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.01.2003 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
17.01.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
11.07.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.07.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.07.2002 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.07.2002 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.07.2002 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.2002 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.08.2001 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.07.2001 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.07.2001 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
31.03.2001 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.2001 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.03.2001 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
20 |
|
17.03.2001 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
17.03.2001 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
17.03.2001 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
10 |
|
14.03.2001 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
10 |
|
18.01.2001 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.01.2001 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.01.2001 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.12.2000 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.11.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.11.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.11.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.11.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.11.2000 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.11.2000 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.11.2000 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
8 |
|
20.11.2000 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.11.2000 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.11.2000 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
14 |
|
20.09.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.09.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.09.2000 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
6 |
|
08.09.2000 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
6 |
|
17.05.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.05.2000 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.04.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.04.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.04.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.04.2000 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.2000 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
26.04.2000 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.2000 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.04.2000 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.2000 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.03.2000 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.03.2000 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.02.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.01.2000 |
Description |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.01.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.01.2000 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.09.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.1999 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
15 |
|
20.05.1999 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.05.1999 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.04.1999 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.04.1999 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
15.04.1999 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
15.04.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.04.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.04.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
15.04.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
13.04.1999 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
17 |
|
05.06.1998 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.1998 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.1998 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.03.1998 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.12.1997 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.12.1997 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.1997 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.12.1997 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
28.11.1997 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.05.1997 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.05.1997 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.1997 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.08.1995 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.08.1995 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.05.1995 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.1995 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.1995 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.05.1995 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
03.05.1995 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.1995 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.05.1995 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
03.05.1995 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |