EP0687794 - Electric remote control device for motor-driven darkening devices like roller shutters or the like [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.06.2000 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.07.2000 [2000/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [1999/31] |
Former [1995/51] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 D-70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meyer-Staufenbiel, Torsten Brucknerweg 4 D-71254 Ditzingen / DE | 02 /
Straeter, Michael, Dipl.-Ing. Kornwestheimer Strasse 21 D-70825 Korntal-Münchingen / DE | [1999/31] |
Former [1995/51] | 01 /
Meyer-Staufenbiel, Torsten, Ing. Brucknerweg 4 D-71254 Ditzingen / DE | ||
02 /
Straeter, Michael, Dipl.-Ing. Kornwestheimer Strasse 21 D-70825 Korntal-Münchingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 95107906.0 | 24.05.1995 | [1995/51] | Priority number, date | DE19944420945 | 16.06.1994 Original published format: DE 4420945 | [1995/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0687794 | Date: | 20.12.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0687794 | Date: | 08.05.1996 | [1996/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0687794 | Date: | 04.08.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.1996 | Classification | IPC: | E06B9/68 | [1995/51] | CPC: |
E06B9/68 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1995/51] | Title | German: | Elektrische Fernsteuervorrichtung für motorische Antriebseinheiten von Verdunkelungsvorrichtungen wie Rolläden od. dgl. | [1995/51] | English: | Electric remote control device for motor-driven darkening devices like roller shutters or the like | [1995/51] | French: | Dispositif de commande à distance électrique pour motorisations des dispositifs d'occultation comme volets à rouleau ou des choses pareilles | [1995/51] | Examination procedure | 08.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/02] | 03.06.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.01.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 04.05.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.05.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3249148 (ZABLODIL RONALD J, et al) [A] 1,9 * the whole document *; | [A]FR1449710 (NAT RES DEV) [A] 1,9,11 * the whole document *; | [DA]DE3304962 (RADEMACHER WILLI) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4119556 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,9,11* the whole document *; | [PX]DE4338339 (KLENK GOTTLIEB [DE]) [PX] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE3304962 | DE3214235 | DE4201971 |