|
14.02.2007 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.01.2007 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.2007 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.01.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.01.2007 |
General enquiry |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.04.2006 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.04.2006 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.04.2006 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.01.2006 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.2006 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.01.2006 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.01.2006 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.01.2006 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.09.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.09.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.09.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.09.2005 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.09.2005 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.09.2005 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.09.2005 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
19 |
|
13.05.2005 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.05.2005 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2005 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.04.2005 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.04.2005 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.04.2005 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.04.2005 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.04.2005 |
Description |
Opposition |
6 |
|
20.04.2005 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
22 |
|
20.04.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.03.2005 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
6 |
|
01.02.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.01.2005 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.01.2005 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.01.2005 |
Drawings |
Appeal |
3 |
|
24.01.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
20.01.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.01.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.01.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.10.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.10.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.10.2004 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.01.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.01.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
23.11.2001 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.11.2001 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.11.2001 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.07.2001 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.07.2001 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
36 |
|
03.07.2001 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
03.07.2001 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
9 |
|
10.05.2001 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.05.2001 |
Document concerning appeal fee |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.05.2001 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.05.2001 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.04.2001 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.03.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.03.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.03.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.03.2001 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.03.2001 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
15.01.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.01.2001 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.12.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.12.2000 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.12.2000 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.2000 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.12.2000 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2000 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.07.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.07.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.07.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.2000 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.2000 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.2000 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.06.2000 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.06.2000 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.06.2000 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.02.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.02.2000 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
05.01.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.01.2000 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.1999 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.08.1999 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.08.1999 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.07.1999 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.07.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
07.07.1999 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
15 |
|
07.07.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
07.07.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
06.07.1999 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
16 |
|
27.08.1998 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.1998 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.1998 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.1998 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.03.1998 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.02.1998 |
Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.10.1997 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.10.1997 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
108 |
|
09.09.1997 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.08.1997 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.08.1997 |
Description |
Search / examination |
37 |
|
01.08.1997 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.03.1997 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.01.1996 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.01.1996 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.11.1995 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.1995 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.1995 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.08.1995 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.1995 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
16.08.1995 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
16.08.1995 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
16.08.1995 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
16.08.1995 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
16.08.1995 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
47 |
|
16.08.1995 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
47 |
|
16.08.1995 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
47 |
|
16.08.1995 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
35 |
|
16.08.1995 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
48 |
|
13.06.1995 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.1995 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.06.1995 |
Description |
Search / examination |
58 |
|
13.06.1995 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.1995 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.1995 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
7 |