|
26.01.2015 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.06.2005 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.06.2005 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.2005 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.04.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.04.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.04.2005 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.2005 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.2005 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.02.2005 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.02.2005 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
11 |
|
04.02.2005 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.01.2005 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
17 |
|
18.11.2004 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
5 |
|
28.10.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.10.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.10.2004 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
24 |
|
20.10.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.10.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.10.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
46 |
|
18.10.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
18.10.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.10.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.10.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
31.08.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.08.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.08.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.08.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.08.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.08.2004 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
5 |
|
09.08.2004 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.08.2004 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.04.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.03.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
19.12.2001 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.11.2001 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.11.2001 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.11.2001 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
7 |
|
27.09.2001 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.09.2001 |
Document concerning appeal fee |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.09.2001 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.09.2001 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.09.2001 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.07.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.07.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.07.2001 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.07.2001 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.07.2001 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.07.2001 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.07.2001 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.07.2001 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
16.07.2001 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.05.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.05.2001 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.05.2001 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.08.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.08.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.08.2000 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.08.2000 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.08.2000 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.07.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.07.2000 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.07.2000 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.07.2000 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.06.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.05.2000 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
18.01.2000 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.01.2000 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.1999 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.1999 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.1999 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.1999 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
02.12.1999 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
44 |
|
02.12.1999 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
02.12.1999 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
01.12.1999 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
21.01.1999 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.12.1998 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.12.1998 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.12.1998 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.08.1998 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.08.1998 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.1998 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.06.1998 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
02.06.1998 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.01.1996 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.01.1996 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.1995 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.1995 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.1995 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.1995 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.1995 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.11.1995 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.11.1995 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.11.1995 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.07.1995 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.1995 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.07.1995 |
Description |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
13.07.1995 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.1995 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.07.1995 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
17.07.1991 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
17.07.1991 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
25 |