EP0701880 - Manipulating device for handling in particular for orientating workpieces, tools or the like [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.02.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.12.2000 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 14.02.2001 [2001/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SASIB TOBACCO S.p.A. Via di Corticella 87/89 40128 Bologna / IT | [1998/20] |
Former [1996/12] | For all designated states SASIB S.p.A. Via di Corticella, 87/89 I-40128 Bologna / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Spada, Walter Via Porrettana Nord 43 I-40043 Marzabotto, Bologna / IT | 02 /
Isani, Gianfranco Via Martiri d'Italia I-10014 Caluso, Torino / IT | [1996/12] | Representative(s) | Porsia, Bruno, et al c/o Succ. Ing. Fischetti & Weber Via Caffaro 3/2 16124 Genova / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1996/12] | Porsia, Bruno, et al c/o Succ. Ing. Fischetti & Weber Via Caffaro 3/2 I-16124 Genova / IT | Application number, filing date | 95113746.2 | 01.09.1995 | [1996/12] | Priority number, date | IT1994GE00104 | 16.09.1994 Original published format: IT GE940104 | [1996/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0701880 | Date: | 20.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0701880 | Date: | 07.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q1/54 | [1996/12] | CPC: |
B23Q1/54 (EP,US);
Y10S483/902 (EP,US);
Y10T29/5155 (EP,US);
Y10T483/1705 (EP,US);
Y10T483/1743 (EP,US);
Y10T483/1781 (EP,US);
Y10T82/16704 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/12] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Handhabung, insbesondere von Werkstücken, Werkzeugen oder dergleichen | [1999/14] | English: | Manipulating device for handling in particular for orientating workpieces, tools or the like | [1996/12] | French: | Manipulateur, notamment pour orienter des pièces, des outils ou similaires | [1996/12] |
Former [1996/12] | Vorrichtung zum Handhabung, insbesondere von Werkstücken, Werkzeugen oder dergleichen | Examination procedure | 28.02.1996 | Examination requested [1996/17] | 03.04.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.10.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 16.11.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 01.09.1999 | [2001/07] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS55125958 ; | [X]DE1552649 (OERLIKON ELEKTRODENFABRIK EISE) [X] 1-4 * claim 5 *; | [XY]EP0068952 (CEF CENTRE ETD FRAISAGE [FR]) [X] 1-4,8 * claim 1 * [Y] 5,6; | [Y]SU1380915 (SP K BYURO ALMAZNO RASTOCH [SU]) [Y] 5,6 * column 2, lines 5-17; figure 3 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19801205), vol. 4, no. 176, Database accession no. (M - 45)<658>, & JP55125958 A 19800929 (HONDA) [A] 1 * abstract * |