EP0702316 - Contactless data carrier system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.02.2000 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.04.2000 [2000/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Suzuki, Kenichi 21-6, 2-chome, Fujimino Hiratsuka Kanagawa-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/12] | For all designated states Suzuki, Kenichi 21-6, 2-chome, Fujimino Hiratsuka, Kanagawa-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1996/12] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/12] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95114147.2 | 08.09.1995 | [1996/12] | Priority number, date | JP19940259896 | 15.09.1994 Original published format: JP 25989694 | [1996/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0702316 | Date: | 20.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G06K7/08, G06K19/07 | [1996/12] | CPC: |
G06K19/07788 (EP);
G06K7/10 (KR);
G06K19/0723 (EP);
G06K7/10326 (EP);
H04B5/72 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1996/12] | Title | German: | Kontakfreies Datenträgersystem | [1996/12] | English: | Contactless data carrier system | [1996/12] | French: | Système de support de données sans contact | [1996/12] | Examination procedure | 08.09.1995 | Examination requested [1996/12] | 26.05.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/14] | 05.11.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2000/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1999 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3611441 (FORTEC GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,6; | [A]DE3630456 (ZEISS IKON AG [DE])[A] 1-6; | [A]DE4025107 (PEPPERL & FUCHS [DE]) [A] 1,6; | [A]DE4224390 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,6; | [A]DE4227551 (EUROSIL ELECTRONIC GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,6 |