|
23.11.2012 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2004 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.12.2004 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.12.2004 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.12.2004 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (proprietor) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.2004 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.09.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.09.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.09.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.09.2004 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.09.2004 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.09.2004 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.09.2004 |
Request for revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.09.2004 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.08.2004 |
Request for revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.04.2004 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.04.2004 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.04.2004 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.2004 |
Reply to the communication concerning admissibility of an opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.04.2004 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.04.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.03.2004 |
Communication indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition which may be remedied |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.03.2004 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.03.2004 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.03.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
17.03.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
17.03.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
17.03.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
15.03.2004 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
15.03.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
38 |
|
03.03.2004 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
03.03.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.05.2003 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.2003 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2003 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.05.2002 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.05.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.05.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2002 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.03.2002 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2002 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.03.2002 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.02.2002 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.12.2001 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.11.2001 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.10.2001 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
10 |
|
25.10.2001 |
F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.10.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.09.2001 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.09.2001 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.09.2001 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.09.2001 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.09.2001 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.08.2001 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.08.2001 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.08.2001 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
26.06.2001 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.06.2001 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.01.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.12.2000 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.12.2000 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.12.2000 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.12.2000 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.12.2000 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
11.10.2000 |
F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.12.1999 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.12.1999 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.10.1999 |
Refund of fees |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.10.1999 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.09.1999 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.09.1999 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
22 |
|
16.09.1999 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
16.09.1999 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
16.09.1999 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
16.09.1999 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
20 |
|
26.08.1999 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.1999 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.1999 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.08.1999 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.1999 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.01.1999 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.09.1998 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.04.1996 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.1996 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.11.1995 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.1995 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.1995 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.11.1995 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.1995 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
15.11.1995 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |