EP0719795 - Method of preparing carbamate-functional polymer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.06.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF CORPORATION 3000 Continental Drive North Mount Olive New Jersey 07828-1234 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/33] | For all designated states BASF CORPORATION 3000 Continental Drive North Mount Olive, New Jersey 07828-1234 / US | ||
Former [1996/27] | For all designated states BASF CORPORATION 3000 Continental Drive North Mount Olive, New Jersey 08728-1234 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Taylor, Robert J. 9289 Tower Road Northville, Michigan 48167 / US | 02 /
Borst, Joseph 15001 Farmbrock Drive Plymouth, Michigan 48170 / US | 03 /
St. Aubin, Donald L. 505 Sherbrooke Commerce TownShip, Michigan 48382 / US | 04 /
Rehfuss, John W. 5900 Dunmore West Bloomfield, Michigan 48322 / US | 05 /
Lessek, Paul 1300 South Duck Lake Road Milford, Michigan 48381 / US | [1996/27] | Representative(s) | Münch, Volker, et al Dres. Fitzner & Münch Rechts- und Patentanwälte Hauser Ring 10 40878 Ratingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/27] | Münch, Volker, Dr., et al BASF Lacke + Farben AG Patente/Lizenzen/Dokumentation Postfach 61 23 D-48136 Münster / DE | Application number, filing date | 95119690.6 | 14.12.1995 | [1996/27] | Priority number, date | US19940365648 | 29.12.1994 Original published format: US 365648 | [1996/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0719795 | Date: | 03.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0719795 | Date: | 07.08.1996 | [1996/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0719795 | Date: | 12.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C08F2/44, C08F20/00 | [1996/27] | CPC: |
C08F220/20 (EP,KR,US);
C08F8/00 (KR);
C08F220/1808 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/27] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Carbamat-funktionellen Polymeren | [1996/27] | English: | Method of preparing carbamate-functional polymer | [1996/27] | French: | Procédé de préparation de polymères à fonctionnalité carbamate | [1996/27] | Examination procedure | 15.01.1997 | Examination requested [1997/11] | 24.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.02.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 16.04.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [2002/10] | IE | 12.08.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US3479328 (NORDSTROM JOHN DAVID) [DA] 1 * claims 1-7 *; | [A]EP0021959 (RHONE POULENC RECH [FR]) [A] 1,9 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0084227 (MOBIL OIL CORP [US]) [Y] 1-11 * page 2, paragraph 4 - page 3, paragraph 3; claims 1-10 *; | [A]US4520074 (O'DONNELL TIMOTHY W [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0297577 (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]) [Y] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0315151 (VEDRIL SPA [IT]) [Y] 1-11 * column 4, line 29 - column 5, line 27; claims 1-10 *; | [DA]WO9410211 (PPG INDUSTRIES INC [US]) [DA] 1* claims 1-12 * |