EP0691258 - Steering mechanism for compact tractors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2001 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.06.2001 [2001/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEW HOLLAND ITALIA S.p.A. Viale delle Nazioni, 55, S. Matteo I-41100 Modena / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1996/02] | For all designated states NEW HOLLAND ITALIA S.p.A. Viale delle Nazioni, 55, S. Matteo I-41100 Modena / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hurlburt, Joseph C. 1829 Wilson Avenue Lancaster, PA 17603 / US | [1996/02] | Representative(s) | Vandenbroucke, Alberic CNH Belgium N.V. Patent Department Leon Claeysstraat, 3A 8210 Zedelgem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/02] | Vandenbroucke, Alberic New Holland Belgium NV. Patent Department Leon Claeysstraat, 3A B-8210 Zedelgem / BE | Application number, filing date | 95201697.0 | 22.06.1995 | [1996/02] | Priority number, date | US19940273081 | 08.07.1994 Original published format: US 273081 | [1996/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0691258 | Date: | 10.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0691258 | Date: | 28.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B62D7/06, B62D9/00 | [1996/02] | CPC: |
B62D9/00 (EP,US);
B62D7/06 (EP,US);
B60G2200/324 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1996/02] | Title | German: | Lenkungsmechanismus für Kleinschlepper | [1996/02] | English: | Steering mechanism for compact tractors | [1996/02] | French: | Mécanisme de direction pour petit tracteur | [1996/02] | Examination procedure | 01.07.1996 | Examination requested [1996/35] | 08.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.10.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.11.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 20.11.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.03.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1013200 (G. STAUB); | [Y]WO8907545 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [Y] 12 * page 9, line 15 - line 19; figure 2 *; | [AD]US5297648 (HANSEN CHARLES A [US], et al); | [XY]EP0598425 (FORD NEW HOLLAND LTD [GB]) [X] 1,9 * claim 1 * [Y] 12 | by applicant | US5297648 | US5299821 |