|
25.08.2010 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.10.2005 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.2005 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.09.2005 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.09.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
12.09.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
12.09.2005 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.06.2005 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
11 |
|
29.06.2005 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.06.2005 |
N/A |
Opposition |
3 |
|
29.06.2005 |
N/a |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.06.2005 |
N/a |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.06.2005 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.2004 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
19 |
|
01.06.2004 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
6 |
|
04.05.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.05.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.05.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.05.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.04.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.04.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.04.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.04.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
22.04.2004 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.04.2004 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.04.2004 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.04.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.04.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.03.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.03.2004 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
26.02.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.02.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.02.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.02.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2004 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
7 |
|
13.02.2004 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.02.2004 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.07.2003 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.06.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.06.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
28.05.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
02.04.2003 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.03.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.11.2002 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.11.2002 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.11.2002 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
25.09.2002 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.09.2002 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.09.2002 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.09.2002 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.09.2002 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.08.2002 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.08.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.08.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.08.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.07.2002 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.07.2002 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
5 |
|
24.07.2002 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.07.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.07.2002 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.07.2002 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.07.2002 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
24.07.2002 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.05.2002 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
06.05.2002 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.2002 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.12.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.12.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.2001 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.06.2001 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
5 |
|
20.06.2001 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
5 |
|
03.05.2001 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.2001 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
19.02.2001 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
15.12.2000 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.2000 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.2000 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.07.2000 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
07.07.2000 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
07.07.2000 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
07.07.2000 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.09.1999 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.1999 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.1999 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.1999 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.06.1999 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.04.1999 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.04.1999 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.1999 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.01.1999 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
28.11.1997 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.10.1996 |
Written request for examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.1996 |
Refund order search fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.1996 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.1996 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.01.1996 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.01.1996 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
15.01.1996 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
06.12.1995 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.1995 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.1995 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.1995 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.1995 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.11.1995 |
Description |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
09.11.1995 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.1995 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.11.1995 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.1995 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.11.1995 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
7 |