|
30.10.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.09.2006 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.08.2006 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
15 |
|
06.07.2006 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
6 |
|
15.02.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.02.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.02.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.01.2006 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
4 |
|
23.01.2006 |
Change of composition of the board (except boards 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.2006 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.07.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.07.2005 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
15.04.2005 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.04.2005 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.04.2005 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.04.2005 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.04.2005 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.04.2005 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
9 |
|
01.04.2005 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
01.04.2005 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
15 |
|
21.02.2005 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.02.2005 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.02.2005 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.02.2005 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.01.2005 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.01.2005 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.01.2005 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.01.2005 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.2004 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
6 |
|
03.12.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.12.2004 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.12.2004 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
03.12.2004 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.2004 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.2004 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.10.2004 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.10.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.10.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.10.2004 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.10.2004 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
6 |
|
12.03.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.03.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.03.2004 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.02.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.02.2004 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.02.2004 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.02.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.02.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.02.2004 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
30.01.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.01.2004 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
15.12.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.2003 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.2003 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.2003 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.06.2003 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.06.2003 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
10.06.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
10.06.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
10.06.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.06.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
09.06.2003 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
34 |
|
01.08.2002 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.05.2002 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.05.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.05.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.03.2002 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.03.2002 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2002 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.2001 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.11.2001 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.11.2001 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
21.05.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.05.2001 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.05.2001 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
23.02.2001 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2000 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.11.2000 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.08.2000 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.08.2000 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.08.2000 |
Description |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
26.08.2000 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
26.08.2000 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.08.2000 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
06.07.2000 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.2000 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.06.2000 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.2000 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.06.1998 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
02.05.1996 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.05.1996 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.12.1995 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.1995 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.12.1995 |
Description |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
02.12.1995 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.1995 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
7 |