EP0668366 - Creep resistant iron-chromium-aluminum alloy and article thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.05.1997 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.06.1997 [1997/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALLEGHENY LUDLUM CORPORATION 1000 Six PPG Place Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15222 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/34] | For all designated states ALLEGHENY LUDLUM CORPORATION 1000 Six PPG Place Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15222 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Larsen, James Martin 5037 Bahama Drive Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania 15239 / US | [1995/34] | Representative(s) | Coxon, Philip, et al Eric Potter & Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/34] | Coxon, Philip, et al Eric Potter & Clarkson St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate Nottingham NG1 1LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 95300437.1 | 25.01.1995 | [1995/34] | Priority number, date | US19940193967 | 09.02.1994 Original published format: US 193967 | [1995/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0668366 | Date: | 23.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C22C38/18, C22C38/26, B01J23/86, F01N3/28 | [1995/34] | CPC: |
C22C38/26 (EP);
C22C38/34 (KR);
B01J23/862 (EP);
C22C38/18 (EP);
F01N3/2807 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, NL, SE [1995/34] | Title | German: | Kriechbeständige Eisen-Chrom-Aluminium-Legierung und Gegenstand daraus | [1995/34] | English: | Creep resistant iron-chromium-aluminum alloy and article thereof | [1995/34] | French: | Alliage de fer-chrome-aluminium résistant au fluage et article à partir de celui-ci | [1995/34] | Examination procedure | 03.11.1995 | Examination requested [1996/01] | 20.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.12.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/26] | 30.01.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1997/26] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1997 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]EP0091526 (ALLEGHENY LUDLUM STEEL [US]) [DX] 1,4,5,7,8 * Tables, in particular samples RV8849C and RV8885C *; | [DX]EP0429793 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP], et al) [DX] 1,2,7,8 *Tables, in particular examples A8 and A9 *; | [DX]EP0290719 (THYSSEN EDELSTAHLWERKE AG [DE]) [DX] 1 * Table, in particular example D *; | [X]JPH04128343 ; | [X]JPH02254136 ; | [X]JPS49115927 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920821), vol. 016, no. 394, Database accession no. (C - 0976), & JP04128343 A 19920428 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [X] 1-4,7,8 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19901226), vol. 014, no. 582, Database accession no. (C - 0792), & JP02254136 A 19901012 (NIPPON STEEL CORP;OTHERS: 02) [X] 1,2,4,7 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 08, no. 75, Database accession no. 75-13515W, & JPS49115927 A 19741106 (KAWASAKI STEEL CORP) [X] 1,2,4 * abstract * | [DA] - JOHNSON, J.N., "INFLUENCE OF COLUMBIUM ON THE 870 C CREEP PROPERTIES OF 18% CHROMIUM FERRITIC STAINLESS STEELS", SOCIETY OF AUTOMOTIVE ENGINEERS, PENNSYLVANIA, USA, vol. 810035, pages 1 - 13 [DA] 1-3 |