EP0683561 - Low-cost low noise block down-converter with a self-oscillating mixer for satellite broadcast receivers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.04.1999 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.04.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.05.1999 [1999/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wang, Guan-Wu No. 3, Alley 18, Lane 648, Ming Hu Road Hsinchu / TW | [1995/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1995/47] | Representative(s) | Moir, Michael Christopher, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/47] | Moir, Michael Christopher, et al Mathys & Squire 100 Grays Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | Application number, filing date | 95303325.5 | 17.05.1995 | [1995/47] | Priority number, date | US19940245598 | 18.05.1994 Original published format: US 245598 | [1995/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0683561 | Date: | 22.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H03C3/16, H03B5/18, H01Q1/24 | [1995/47] | CPC: |
H03B5/1876 (EP,US);
H01Q1/247 (EP,US);
H03D7/125 (EP,US);
H03D9/0683 (EP,US);
H03B2200/0024 (EP,US);
H03B2200/0048 (EP,US);
H03B5/1852 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1995/47] | Title | German: | Kostengünstiger, rauscharmer Frequenzumsetzer mit Mischer in Selbsterregung für Satellitenempfänger | [1995/47] | English: | Low-cost low noise block down-converter with a self-oscillating mixer for satellite broadcast receivers | [1995/47] | French: | Convertisseur de fréquence, pour des récepteurs à satellite, à coût réduit, à faible niveau de bruit, comprenant un mélangeur auto-oscillant | [1995/47] | Examination procedure | 22.05.1996 | Examination requested [1996/29] | 19.09.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.11.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/20] | 23.12.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1999/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4219779 (SHINAGAWA MITSUHISA [JP], et al) [A] 1-24 * column 3, line 53 - column 4, line 67; figures 4,5 *; | [Y]US4498061 (MOERZ GUENTHER [DE], et al) [Y] 4,5,9-20 * column 2, line 41 - column 3, line 19; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US4595890 (CLOUTIER DONALD C [US]) [A] 9,10 * column 3, line 65 - column 5, line 20; figures 6-8 *; | [A]US4596045 (MAIER GERHARD [DE]) [A] 1,4,5,9-11,16,17,21* column 3, line 25 - column 4, line 27; figure 1 *; | [XY]US4605909 (TSIRONIS CHRISTOS [FR]) [X] 1-3,21 * column 3, lines 26-44 - column 2, lines 62-66; figure 1 * [Y] 4-20,22-24; | [XA]GB2235585 (BRITISH AEROSPACE [GB]) [X] 1,21 * page 3, line 1 - page 4, line 22; figures 1,2 * [A] 11; | [Y]EP0555689 (THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS [FR]) [Y] 6-8,22-24 * column 2, line 47 - column 6, line 4; figures 1-3 * |