EP0694349 - Modular transfer system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.10.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.11.1999 [1999/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Livernois Research & Development Company 25315 Kean Avenue Dearborn Michigan 48124 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/05] | For all designated states Livernois Research & Development Company 25315 Kean Avenue Dearborn, Michigan 48124 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wallis, Bernard Joseph 2215 Dacosta Dearborn, Michigan 48128 / US | 02 /
Bianchi, Sabatino A. 25315 Kean Avenue Dearborn, Michigan 48124 / US | [1996/05] | Representative(s) | Singleton, Jeffrey Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/05] | Singleton, Jeffrey Eric Potter Clarkson St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate Nottingham NG1 1LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 95303387.5 | 22.05.1995 | [1996/05] | Priority number, date | US19940280089 | 25.07.1994 Original published format: US 280089 | [1996/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0694349 | Date: | 31.01.1996 | [1996/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B21D43/05 | [1996/05] | CPC: |
B21D43/055 (EP,US);
B21D43/05 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1996/05] | Title | German: | Modulares Transport-System | [1996/05] | English: | Modular transfer system | [1996/05] | French: | Système modulaire de transfert | [1996/05] | Examination procedure | 22.07.1996 | Examination requested [1996/38] | 24.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 31.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 07.11.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.12.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/47] | 05.03.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1999/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1998 | 04   M06   Not yet paid | 31.05.1999 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3807215 (ALLWEIER W, et al); | [A]DE2632593 (AIDA ENG LTD) [A] 1 * figure 12 *; | [AD]US4032018 (WALLIS BERNARD J) [AD] 1 * column W *; | [X]DE3320830 (SCHOEN HANS) [X] 1-26 * page 14, line 23 - line 27; figure - *; | [AD]US5307666 (BIANCHI SABATINO A [US]) | by applicant | US4032018 | US5307666 |