EP0701242 - Method of generating multiple-master typefaces [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.06.2002 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.08.2002 [2002/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADOBE SYSTEMS INC. 1585 Charleston Road Mountain View California 94039-7900 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/11] | For all designated states ADOBE SYSTEMS INC. 1585 Charleston Road Mountain View California 94039-7900 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dowling, Terence S. 19959 Lanark Lane Saratoga, California 95070-5023 / US | 02 /
Von Zelowitz, Jonathan A. 1320 Guerrero Street San Francisco, California 94110-3623 / US | [1996/11] | Representative(s) | Wombwell, Francis Forresters 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/11] | Wombwell, Francis Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside L41 6BR / GB | Application number, filing date | 95304971.5 | 17.07.1995 | [1996/11] | Priority number, date | US19940291602 | 16.08.1994 Original published format: US 291602 | [1996/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0701242 | Date: | 13.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0701242 | Date: | 27.12.1996 | [1996/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G09G5/24, G06T11/20 | [1996/51] | CPC: |
G06K15/02 (EP,US);
B41B19/00 (EP,US);
G06T11/203 (EP,US);
G06K2215/0028 (EP,US);
G06K2215/0054 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1996/11] | G09G5/24 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1996/11] | Title | German: | Verbessertes Verfahren zum Generieren von Mehrmaster-Schrifttypen | [1996/11] | English: | Method of generating multiple-master typefaces | [1996/11] | French: | Procédé amélioré de génération de données typographiques à maîtres multiples | [1996/11] | Examination procedure | 13.01.1997 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.06.1997 | Examination requested [1997/33] | 01.02.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/32] | 07.03.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2002/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2001 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US4933866 (MARKOFF JAY [US], et al) [DA] 1,2 * column 4, line 63 - column 5, line 33 *; | [A]US5319358 (MARTINEZ EDUARDO [US], et al) [A] 1 * claim 1 * | [A] - MCQUEEN C D III ET AL, "Infinifont: a parametric font generation system", THIRD INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON RASTER IMAGING AND DIGITAL TYPOGRAPHY. RIDT'94, DARMSTADT, GERMANY, 11-13 APRIL 1994, ISSN 0894-3982, ELECTRONIC PUBLISHING: ORIGINATION, DISSEMINATION AND DESIGN, SEPT. 1993, UK, vol. 6, no. 3, pages 117 - 132, XP000605788 [A] 1,2 * page 124, paragraph 4.1 * * page 128, paragraph 4.3.3 * | [A] - HARALAMBOUS Y, "Parametrization of PostScript fonts through METAFONT-an alternative to Adobe Multiple Master Fonts", THIRD INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON RASTER IMAGING AND DIGITAL TYPOGRAPHY. RIDT'94, DARMSTADT, GERMANY, 11-13 APRIL 1994, ISSN 0894-3982, ELECTRONIC PUBLISHING: ORIGINATION, DISSEMINATION AND DESIGN, SEPT. 1993, UK, vol. 6, no. 3, pages 145 - 157, XP000605799 [A] 1 * page 146, paragraph 1.1 * * page 148, paragraph 2 * | [A] - BOAG A, "Fonts: a survey of current issues", DESKTOP PUBLISHING COMMENTARY, JUNE 1994, UK, ISSN 0957-3178, vol. 10, no. 2, pages 6 - 9, XP000605817 [A] 1 * page 9, column M, line 19 - column R, line 23 * | by applicant | US4933866 | US5185818 |