EP0721016 - Nucleic acid library arrays, methods for synthesizing them and methods for sequencing and sample screening using them [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.04.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.04.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.05.2007 [2007/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AFFYMAX TECHNOLOGIES N.V. De Ruyterkade 62 Willemstad Curaçao / AN | [N/P] |
Former [1996/28] | For all designated states AFFYMAX TECHNOLOGIES N.V. De Ruyterkade 62 Willemstad, Curaçao / AN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lockhart, David J. 480 Oakgrove Drive 205 Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | 02 /
Chee, Mark S. 3199 Waverley Street Palo Alto, California, 94306 / US | 03 /
Vetter, Dirk Zum Rodel 11 D-99428 Weimar-Gaberndorf / DE | 04 /
Diggelmann, Martin Dorfgasse 68 CH-4435 Niederdorf / CH | [1996/30] |
Former [1996/28] | 01 /
Lockhart, David J. 480 Oakgrove Drive 205 Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | ||
02 /
Chee, Mark S. 3199 Waverley Street Palo Alto, California, 94306 / US | |||
03 /
Vetter, Dirk Husserlstr. 14 D-79110 Freiburg / DE | |||
04 /
Diggelmann, Martin Dorfgasse 68 CH-4435 Niederdorf / CH | Representative(s) | Voelker, Ingeborg Carla Emmy, et al Uexküll & Stolberg Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/35] | Voelker, Ingeborg Carla Emmy, et al Uexküll & Stolberg Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [1996/28] | Bizley, Richard Edward, et al Hepworth, Lawrence, Bryer & Bizley Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane Epping Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 95307501.7 | 20.10.1995 | [1996/28] | Priority number, date | US19940327522 | 21.10.1994 Original published format: US 327522 | US19940327687 | 24.10.1994 Original published format: US 327687 | US19950533582 | 18.10.1995 Original published format: US 533582 | [1996/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0721016 | Date: | 10.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0721016 | Date: | 03.11.1999 | [1999/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, C07H21/00 | [1996/28] | CPC: |
C12N15/1093 (EP,US);
B01J19/0046 (EP,US);
C07H21/00 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6827 (EP,US);
C12Q1/683 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6837 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6874 (EP,US);
C40B80/00 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00529 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00608 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00612 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00626 (EP,US);
B01J2219/0063 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00659 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00722 (EP,US);
C07B2200/11 (EP,US);
C40B40/06 (EP,US);
G01N33/5308 (EP,US);
G01N33/551 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1996/28] | Title | German: | Immobilisierte Nukleinsäure-Banken, Verfahren für ihre Herstellung und ihre Vewendung in Sequenzierungs- und Screeningsverfahren | [1996/28] | English: | Nucleic acid library arrays, methods for synthesizing them and methods for sequencing and sample screening using them | [1996/28] | French: | Banque d'acides nucléiques immobilisées, procédés pour leur fabrication et procédés de séquençage et de screening les utilisant | [1996/28] | Examination procedure | 02.11.1995 | Examination requested [1996/28] | 24.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.10.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/21] | 22.12.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2006 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0142299 (FUJIREBIO KK [JP]) [Y] 11 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0259031 (MASSACHUSETTS EYE & EAR INFIRM [US], et al) [Y] 1,2 * figure 5 *; | [Y]EP0360940 (CHIRON CORP [US]) [Y] 11 * figure 2 *; | [Y]US4946773 (MANIATIS THOMAS P [US], et al) [Y] 1,2 * abstract *; | [Y]WO9115600 (HOPE CITY [US]) [Y] 1,5 * abstract *; | [DAY]WO9210588 (AFFYMAX TECH NV [NL]) [DA] 3,4,6-10 * the whole document * [Y] 1,2,5,11; | [X]WO9411530 (UNIV BOSTON [US]) [X] 3,4,6-10 * figures 9,10; examples 5,12; claim - *; | [PX]WO9504160 (ISIS INNOVATION [GB], et al) [PX] 3,4,6-10* the whole document *; | [PX]WO9509248 (ARCH DEV CORP [US], et al) [PX] 3,4,6-10 * page 13, paragraph 3; figure 1; example 7; claim - *; | [A] - BROUDE N E ET AL, "ENHANCED DNA SEQUENCING BY HYBRIDIZATION", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, (19940401), vol. 91, no. CONF. 45, pages 3072 - 3076, XP000619675 [A] 3,4,6-9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.91.8.3072 | [A] - CANTOR C R ET AL, "REPORT ONT HE SEQUENCING BY HYBRIDIZATION WORKSHOP", GENOMICS, (19920801), vol. 13, no. 4, pages 1378 - 1383, XP000602229 [A] 1-11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0888-7543(92)90079-8 |