EP0715265 - Machine translation system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 545-0013 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/24] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 545-0013 / JP | ||
Former [1996/23] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pozanski, Victor 108 Church Road Sandford on Thames, Oxford OX4 4YB / GB | 02 /
Beaven, John Luis 34 Henley Street Oxford, OX4 1ES / GB | 03 /
Johnson, Ian 44 Fairfield Road Winchester, Hampshire / GB | [1996/23] | Representative(s) | Robinson, John Stuart Marks & Clerk LLP 4220 Nash Court Oxford Business Park South Oxford OX4 2RU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Robinson, John Stuart Marks & Clerk, 4220 Nash Court, Oxford Business Park South Oxford OX4 2RU / GB | ||
Former [2002/24] | Robinson, John Stuart Marks & Clerk Nash Court Oxford Business Park South Oxford OX4 2RU / GB | ||
Former [1996/23] | Robinson, John Stuart MARKS & CLERK, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham, B1 1TT / GB | Application number, filing date | 95308512.3 | 28.11.1995 | [1996/23] | Priority number, date | GB19940023995 | 28.11.1994 Original published format: GB 9423995 | [1996/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0715265 | Date: | 05.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0715265 | Date: | 02.07.1997 | [1997/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0715265 | Date: | 12.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/28 | [1996/23] | CPC: |
G06F40/211 (EP,US);
G06F40/268 (EP,US);
G06F40/284 (EP,US);
G06F40/55 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/23] | Title | German: | Maschinelles Übersetzungssystem | [1996/23] | English: | Machine translation system | [1996/23] | French: | Système de traduction automatique | [1996/23] | Examination procedure | 13.10.1997 | Examination requested [1997/50] | 27.01.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.12.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0568319 (SHARP KK [JP]) [DA] 1-9 * abstract * * column 11, line 35 - column 13, line 42 *; | [A]US5321607 (FUKUMOCHI YOJI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]GB2122782 (KOKUSAI DENSHIN DENWA CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |