|
25.01.2007 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.01.2007 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
15 |
|
21.11.2006 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
4 |
|
24.10.2006 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.10.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.10.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
23 |
|
05.10.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.10.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.10.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.09.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.07.2006 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.07.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.07.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.07.2006 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.07.2006 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
4 |
|
18.07.2006 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.02.2006 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.01.2006 |
F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.01.2006 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.06.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.05.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.05.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
27.05.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
01.04.2004 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.03.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.02.2004 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.01.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.09.2003 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.09.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
04.09.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
09.07.2003 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.07.2003 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.07.2003 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.07.2003 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.06.2003 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.05.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.05.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.04.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.04.2003 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
10 |
|
30.04.2003 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
19 |
|
30.04.2003 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
30.04.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
5 |
|
30.04.2003 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.04.2003 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
11 |
|
30.04.2003 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.04.2003 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.01.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.2003 |
Claims |
Opposition |
7 |
|
23.01.2003 |
Claims |
Opposition |
7 |
|
23.01.2003 |
Claims |
Opposition |
7 |
|
23.01.2003 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
6 |
|
22.01.2003 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.2003 |
Claims |
Opposition |
7 |
|
20.01.2003 |
Claims |
Opposition |
7 |
|
20.01.2003 |
Claims |
Opposition |
7 |
|
20.01.2003 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
6 |
|
08.08.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2002 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.2002 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.2002 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.04.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2002 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.04.2002 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.03.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.03.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.03.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.03.2002 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.03.2002 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.05.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.05.2001 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.05.2001 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.04.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.04.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.04.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.04.2001 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.04.2001 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.04.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.2000 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.12.2000 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.12.2000 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.06.2000 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.05.2000 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.04.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.2000 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.04.2000 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.04.2000 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.12.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.12.1999 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.12.1999 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.1999 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.12.1999 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.12.1999 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.11.1999 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.1999 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.06.1999 |
Claims |
Opposition |
7 |
|
01.06.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
01.06.1999 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
01.04.1999 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.04.1999 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.03.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.1999 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.1999 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
03.03.1999 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
03.03.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
03.03.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
21 |
|
01.03.1999 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
01.03.1999 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
04.12.1998 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.04.1998 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.03.1998 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.03.1998 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.03.1998 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
21.03.1998 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
06.02.1998 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.02.1998 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
24.11.1997 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.09.1995 |
Written request for examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.08.1995 |
Refund order search fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.1995 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.1995 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.03.1995 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.03.1995 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
17.03.1995 |
Description |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
17.03.1995 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.03.1995 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.03.1995 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
17.03.1995 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |