EP0686796 - Support device for a cable chute [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.07.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.09.1998 [1998/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC SA 40, avenue André Morizet 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/50] | For all designated states SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC SA 40, avenue André Morizet F-92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jego, Gérard 12, rue Louis Pasteur F-21470 Brazey en Plaine / FR | 02 /
Thierry, Jean-Pierre 36, rue des Espaces Verts, Couternon F-21560 Arc-sur-Tille / FR | 03 /
Nourry, Daniel 14, rue Dom Edmond Martene F-21000 Dijon / FR | [1995/50] | Representative(s) | Saint Martin, René Schneider Electric Industries SAS, Service Propriété Industrielle, 89, boulevard Franklin Roosevelt 92500 Rueil Malmaison / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/50] | Saint Martin, René Schneider Electric SA, Service Propriété Industrielle, 33 bis, avenue du Maréchal Joffre F-92000 Nanterre / FR | Application number, filing date | 95401142.5 | 17.05.1995 | [1995/50] | Priority number, date | FR19940007166 | 09.06.1994 Original published format: FR 9407166 | [1995/50] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0686796 | Date: | 13.12.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0686796 | Date: | 10.09.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F16L3/10, F16L3/24, H02G3/26 | [1995/50] | CPC: |
F16L3/1075 (EP,US);
F16L3/24 (EP,US);
H02G3/263 (EP,US);
Y10T24/4453 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, GB, IT, LI, SE [1995/50] | Title | German: | Stützvorrichtung für Kabelrinne | [1995/50] | English: | Support device for a cable chute | [1995/50] | French: | Dispositif de support pour goulotte | [1995/50] | Examination procedure | 20.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/50] | 11.02.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.03.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.05.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 20.05.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.06.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 10.12.1997 | [1998/15] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5109580 (CAMUS MARK [US]) [A] 1,7 * abstract *; | [A]US3809799 (TAYLOR P) [A] 1,3-5 * abstract *; | [A]US5305978 (CURRENT WAYNE [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]GB1194478 (INSULOID MFG COMPANY) |