EP0719570 - Implantable device with protection means against electromagnetic disturbances [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.2004 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 05.01.2005 [2005/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELA MEDICAL (Société anonyme) 98, Rue Maurice Arnoux 92541 Montrouge / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/27] | For all designated states ELA MEDICAL (Société anonyme) 98, Rue Maurice Arnoux F-92541 Montrouge / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pons, Pascal 53, Impasse Foulques F-38320 Crolles / FR | 02 /
Dal Molin, Renzo 7, allée Mozart F-92320 Chatillon / FR | [1996/27] | Representative(s) | Dupuis-Latour, Dominique, et al Bardehle Pagenberg SPE SAS SO Square Opéra 5, rue Boudreau 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/27] | Dupuis-Latour, Dominique, et al Avocats à la Cour, Cabinet Bardehle, Pagenberg & Partner, 45, avenue Montaigne 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 95402975.7 | 29.12.1995 | [1996/27] | Priority number, date | FR19940015911 | 30.12.1994 Original published format: FR 9415911 | [1996/27] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0719570 | Date: | 03.07.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0719570 | Date: | 09.04.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/37 | [1996/27] | CPC: |
A61N1/3706 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1996/27] | Title | German: | Implantierbare Vorrichtung mit Schutzmitteln gegen elektromagnetische Störungen | [1996/27] | English: | Implantable device with protection means against electromagnetic disturbances | [1996/27] | French: | Dispositif implantable comprenant des moyens de protection contre les perturbations électromagnétiques | [1996/27] | Examination procedure | 27.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/05] | 05.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 27.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 30.10.2003 | BE | 31.12.2003 | CH | 31.12.2003 | LI | 31.12.2003 | [2005/01] |
Former [2004/51] | ES | 30.10.2003 | |
CH | 31.12.2003 | ||
LI | 31.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | ES | 30.10.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0228539 (INTERMEDICS INC [US]) [A] 1,2 * column W *; | [A]US4739437 (MORGAN WAYNE A [US]) [A] 1,2* column W * |