|
16.03.2005 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.08.2004 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
16 |
|
08.07.2004 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.06.2004 |
F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.06.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.06.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.03.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.03.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.03.2004 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
7 |
|
08.03.2004 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.2004 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.02.2002 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.11.2001 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.09.2001 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.09.2001 |
Notice of appeal/statement of grounds |
Appeal |
4 |
|
10.09.2001 |
Notice of appeal/statement of grounds |
Appeal |
3 |
|
10.09.2001 |
Notice of appeal/statement of grounds |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.07.2001 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.07.2001 |
Notice of appeal/statement of grounds |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.06.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2001 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.05.2001 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.05.2001 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
28.05.2001 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.05.2001 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2000 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.11.2000 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.11.2000 |
Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.11.2000 |
Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
14.09.2000 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2000 |
Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.09.2000 |
Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2000 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.02.2000 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2000 |
Transmittal of third party observations to applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.02.2000 |
Citation filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
09.02.2000 |
Citation filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.02.2000 |
Citation filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
09.02.2000 |
Citation filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.02.2000 |
Citation filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
09.02.2000 |
Citation filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
09.02.2000 |
Citation filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.02.2000 |
Citation filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
09.02.2000 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
21.01.2000 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.2000 |
Transmittal of third party observations to applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.12.1999 |
Citation filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
27.12.1999 |
Citation filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
27.12.1999 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.10.1999 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.10.1999 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.10.1999 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.10.1999 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.08.1999 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.08.1999 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.1999 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.03.1999 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.02.1999 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.01.1999 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.01.1999 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.12.1998 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.12.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.1998 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.03.1997 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.1997 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.1997 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.05.1995 |
Refund order search fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.05.1995 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.05.1995 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.03.1995 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.1995 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.03.1995 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
01.03.1995 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.1995 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.1995 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.1995 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.03.1995 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
01.03.1995 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |