|
10.09.2018 |
CDS Clean up - amended opponent data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2015 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.02.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.02.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.02.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.02.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.02.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.01.2015 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
14 |
|
28.01.2015 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.01.2015 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.12.2014 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.12.2014 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.12.2014 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.12.2014 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.12.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.12.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.12.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.12.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.12.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.10.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.10.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.10.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.09.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.09.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.09.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.09.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.09.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.08.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.08.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.08.2014 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.08.2014 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.08.2014 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.03.2014 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.02.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.12.2013 |
F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.12.2013 |
F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.07.2013 |
Communication of amended entries |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.05.2013 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.09.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.09.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
10 |
|
03.09.2012 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.08.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
11 |
|
28.08.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
11 |
|
14.08.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
10 |
|
14.03.2012 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2011 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.02.2011 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.12.2010 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.12.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.12.2010 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.10.2010 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.08.2010 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.07.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.07.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.07.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.07.2010 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
27.07.2010 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
27.07.2010 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
02.06.2010 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.05.2010 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.05.2010 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.05.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.2010 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.04.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.03.2010 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.03.2010 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
26.03.2010 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.2010 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
17.03.2010 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.2010 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.2010 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.01.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.01.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.01.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.01.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
04.01.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
04.01.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
04.01.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
04.01.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
04.01.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
65 |
|
04.01.2010 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
9 |
|
23.12.2009 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
9 |
|
08.08.2009 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.07.2009 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.07.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.07.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.2009 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.07.2009 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.07.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.07.2009 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
02.07.2009 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.07.2009 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.07.2009 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.06.2009 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.06.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.06.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
13.06.2008 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
11.06.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
11.06.2008 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
16.04.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.2008 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.04.2008 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.04.2008 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.04.2008 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.03.2008 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.03.2008 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.03.2008 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2008 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2008 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.2008 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.01.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
16.01.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
16.01.2008 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
16.01.2008 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
16.01.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
16.01.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
16.01.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
26 |
|
16.01.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
11.01.2008 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
11.01.2008 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
07.08.2007 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.08.2007 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.2007 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2007 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.02.2007 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.2007 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.2007 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.02.2007 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.02.2007 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.02.2007 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.02.2007 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.12.2006 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.2006 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.12.2006 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.2006 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.2006 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.2006 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.10.2006 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
26.09.2006 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.08.2006 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.2006 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
06.06.2006 |
Description |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.06.2006 |
Description |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.06.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.04.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.04.2006 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.01.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.11.2005 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.09.2005 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.05.2005 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.2004 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.2004 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.11.2004 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.07.2004 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
4 |
|
18.06.2004 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
15 |
|
10.05.2004 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
3 |
|
26.04.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.04.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.04.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.04.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.04.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.04.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
22.04.2004 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
22.04.2004 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
19.04.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.04.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.04.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.04.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.04.2004 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.12.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.12.2003 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
17.11.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
12.11.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
10.11.2003 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.10.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.09.2003 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.09.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.09.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.09.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.09.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.12.1998 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.1998 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.12.1998 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
10.12.1998 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
03.12.1998 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.09.1998 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.1998 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.09.1998 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.08.1998 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.1998 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.1998 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.07.1998 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.1998 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.03.1998 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.02.1998 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.02.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.1997 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.11.1997 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.1997 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.11.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.11.1997 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.09.1997 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.06.1997 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.06.1997 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.1997 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the applicant/patent proprietor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.04.1997 |
Request for change of name of the applicant |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.03.1997 |
Request for change of name of the applicant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.12.1995 |
Written request for examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.08.1995 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.08.1995 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.02.1995 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.02.1995 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.02.1995 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.02.1995 |
Description |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
27.02.1995 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.02.1995 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
27.02.1995 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
7 |