|
17.09.2004 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
15 |
|
03.06.2004 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.05.2004 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
14.05.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
13.05.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.05.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
05.05.2004 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
5 |
|
04.05.2004 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.04.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.03.2004 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.03.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.03.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.03.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.03.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.03.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.03.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.03.2004 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.03.2004 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.11.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.11.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
21 |
|
12.08.2002 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2002 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.06.2002 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
03.06.2002 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.04.2002 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.04.2002 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.04.2002 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.03.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.02.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.02.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.02.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.02.2002 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.2002 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.02.2002 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.02.2002 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.02.2002 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.2002 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.02.2002 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2001 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.08.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.08.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.08.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.08.2001 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.08.2001 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.08.2001 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
31.07.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.07.2001 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.2001 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.07.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.07.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.07.2001 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.07.2001 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.07.2001 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
16.07.2001 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.07.2001 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.2001 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.06.2001 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.06.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.05.2001 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
23.05.2001 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
02.04.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.04.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.04.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.03.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.03.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.01.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.01.2001 |
General enquiry |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.11.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.10.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.09.2000 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.08.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.07.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.01.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.12.1999 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.12.1999 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
29.10.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.10.1999 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.10.1999 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.1999 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.06.1999 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.06.1999 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.1999 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
26.04.1999 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
17 |
|
26.04.1999 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
26.04.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
26.04.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
26.04.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
18.06.1998 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.04.1998 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.04.1998 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.04.1998 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.01.1998 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.01.1998 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.1997 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.10.1997 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
30.09.1997 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.05.1996 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
12.09.1995 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.09.1995 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.1995 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.06.1995 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.05.1995 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.05.1995 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
26.05.1995 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
18 |