EP0733148 - HOLDER FOR SUPPORTING GLASS PANES WITHOUT SUBJECTING THEM TO BENDING MOMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.06.1998 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.07.1998 [1998/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DANZ, Robert Cheruskerstrasse 13 D-71101 Schönaich / DE | [1996/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1996/39] | Representative(s) | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Gropiusplatz 10 70563 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/20] | KOHLER SCHMID + PARTNER Patentanwälte Ruppmannstrasse 27 70565 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1996/39] | Böhmer, Hans Erich, Dipl.-Ing. Keplerstrasse 23 71134 Aidlingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 95902775.6 | 18.11.1994 | [1996/39] | WO1994EP03829 | Priority number, date | DE19934342097 | 10.12.1993 Original published format: DE 4342097 | [1996/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9516099 | Date: | 15.06.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0733148 | Date: | 25.09.1996 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.06.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0733148 | Date: | 06.08.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.06.1995 | Classification | IPC: | E06B3/54, F16C11/06 | [1996/39] | CPC: |
B32B17/10293 (EP);
B32B17/10055 (EP);
E04D3/08 (EP);
E06B3/5436 (EP);
F16C11/0619 (EP);
E04D2003/065 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1996/39] | Title | German: | HALTERUNG FÜR DIE BIEGEMOMENTFREIE LAGERUNG VON GLASPLATTEN | [1996/39] | English: | HOLDER FOR SUPPORTING GLASS PANES WITHOUT SUBJECTING THEM TO BENDING MOMENTS | [1996/39] | French: | SUPPORT POUR LE MAINTIEN, SANS MOMENT DE FLEXION, DE PANNEAUX EN VERRE | [1996/39] | Entry into regional phase | 16.10.1995 | National basic fee paid | 16.10.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.10.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.10.1995 | Examination requested [1996/39] | 31.10.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.02.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 30.04.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3146008 (STEPHEN GEORGE) [A] 1* figure 4 *; | [A]US4121893 (MORISSETTE GILLES) [A] 1 * column 1, line 46 - column 3, line 4; figure - *; | [DA]DE3927653 (DANZ ROBERT [DE]) [DA] 1,2,4,6 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2242248 (SUMMERS THOMAS ALBERT) [A] 1 * page 4, line 21 - page 6, line 2; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0506522 (SAINT GOBAIN VITRAGE [FR]) [A] 1 * column 7, line 33 - column 8, line 20; figure 5 *; | [A]FR2676768 (PONTE JEAN FRANCOIS [FR]) [A] 1 * page 6, line 12 - line 36; figure 1 * | Examination | - EP-A- 0 506 522 | - DE-A- 3 927 653 | - FR-A- 2 676 768 | - GB-A- 2 242 248 | - US-A- 3 146 008 | - US-A- 4 121 893 |