|
26.06.2013 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.2007 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.08.2007 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
45 |
|
06.06.2007 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
5 |
|
04.05.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.05.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.05.2007 |
Description |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.05.2007 |
Description |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.05.2007 |
Description |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.05.2007 |
Description |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.05.2007 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
30.04.2007 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
30.04.2007 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.04.2007 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.03.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.03.2007 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.03.2007 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.03.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.03.2007 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.2007 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.02.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.02.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.02.2007 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.02.2007 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.02.2007 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.02.2007 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.02.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.02.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.02.2007 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
8 |
|
30.01.2007 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.01.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.01.2007 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
02.06.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.06.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.05.2006 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.05.2006 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.05.2006 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.05.2006 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
26.05.2006 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
22.05.2006 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
22.05.2006 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
16.03.2006 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.03.2006 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.02.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.01.2006 |
Request concerning the applicant/representative |
Appeal |
3 |
|
14.11.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.11.2005 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.11.2005 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.11.2005 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
22 |
|
04.11.2005 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
22 |
|
03.11.2005 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
11 |
|
31.10.2005 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
11 |
|
24.10.2005 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.09.2005 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.09.2005 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.09.2005 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.09.2005 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.09.2005 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.08.2005 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.08.2005 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.08.2005 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.08.2005 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.07.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.07.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.07.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.07.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.06.2005 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
27 |
|
24.06.2005 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
12 |
|
24.06.2005 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
24.06.2005 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
15 |
|
24.06.2005 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.06.2005 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.06.2005 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.06.2005 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.06.2005 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.06.2005 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.06.2005 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
12 |
|
06.05.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.05.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.04.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.04.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.04.2005 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.04.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
8 |
|
25.04.2005 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.04.2005 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
16.04.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
16.04.2005 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
8 |
|
16.03.2005 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.2005 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.2005 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.2005 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.02.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.2005 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.02.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
5 |
|
10.02.2005 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.02.2005 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.06.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
21.05.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
18.03.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.03.2004 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.02.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2003 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.10.2003 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
27.10.2003 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.10.2003 |
Claims |
Opposition |
6 |
|
20.10.2003 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.06.2003 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.06.2003 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.06.2003 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.06.2003 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2003 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.05.2003 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.2003 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
29.04.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
29.04.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
20.06.2002 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.06.2002 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.05.2002 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.05.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.05.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.05.2002 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
19.03.2002 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (translations of claims/payment missing) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.11.2001 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.10.2001 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2001 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.2001 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.09.2001 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.2001 |
Request for change of name of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2001 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2001 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.06.2001 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
28.05.2001 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.10.2000 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.10.2000 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.10.2000 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.06.2000 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.03.1998 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.01.1998 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.01.1998 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.01.1998 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
30.07.1997 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.07.1996 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.1996 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.07.1996 |
Refund order search fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.05.1996 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.05.1996 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
25.01.1996 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.1996 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.01.1996 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.01.1996 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.01.1996 |
Description |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
25.01.1996 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.01.1996 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |