|
23.07.2003 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
11 |
|
23.07.2003 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.07.2003 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.05.2003 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
9 |
|
19.05.2003 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.03.2003 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.03.2003 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.03.2003 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.03.2003 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.03.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.03.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.03.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.03.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.03.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.02.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.02.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.01.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.01.2003 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.01.2003 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.01.2003 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.01.2003 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.11.2001 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.10.2001 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
07.08.2001 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.07.2001 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.06.2001 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.06.2001 |
Composition of the board (only boards 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.06.2001 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.04.2001 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.04.2001 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.04.2001 |
Document concerning appeal fee |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.03.2001 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.03.2001 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.02.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.02.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.02.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.02.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.02.2001 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.02.2001 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.02.2001 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.02.2001 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
05.02.2001 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.12.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.2000 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.11.2000 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.11.2000 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.11.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.11.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.11.2000 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.11.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.2000 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2000 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.11.2000 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.11.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.11.2000 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
16.11.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.07.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.06.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.06.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.06.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.05.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.05.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.05.2000 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.2000 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.05.2000 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.2000 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.04.2000 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.04.2000 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.04.2000 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.10.1999 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.10.1999 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.10.1999 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
04.10.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.09.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.09.1999 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.08.1999 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.04.1999 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.04.1999 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
01.04.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.03.1999 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.02.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.02.1999 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.02.1999 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.12.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.1998 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.12.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.08.1998 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.08.1998 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.07.1998 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.06.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.06.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
30.06.1998 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
14 |
|
30.06.1998 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.06.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
19 |
|
21.08.1997 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.1997 |
Approval of request for amendments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.1997 |
Description |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
28.04.1997 |
Request for correction |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.1997 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.1997 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.04.1997 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.04.1997 |
Request for correction |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
25.03.1997 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.03.1997 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.1997 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.02.1997 |
Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.1996 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.11.1996 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
04.11.1996 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.08.1996 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.03.1996 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.03.1996 |
Description |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.03.1996 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.03.1996 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.03.1996 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.03.1996 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
11.03.1996 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.08.1995 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.07.1995 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.06.1995 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.06.1995 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
29.06.1995 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
20 |