|
20.10.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.10.2003 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.10.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.10.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.10.2003 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.10.2003 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.10.2003 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.10.2003 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.10.2003 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
3 |
|
02.10.2003 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.10.2003 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.10.2003 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
7 |
|
10.09.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.09.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.09.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.08.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.08.2003 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.08.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.08.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.08.2003 |
|
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.08.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.08.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.08.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.08.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.06.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.05.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.05.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.05.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.05.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.05.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.05.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.05.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.05.2003 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.05.2003 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
15.05.2003 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.05.2003 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.05.2003 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.05.2003 |
Description |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.05.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.05.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.04.2003 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.04.2003 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.04.2003 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.04.2003 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
4 |
|
11.04.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.04.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.04.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.04.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
04.04.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.04.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.04.2003 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
04.04.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.03.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
28.03.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
27.12.2002 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
09.12.2002 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.11.2002 |
F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) |
Appeal |
5 |
|
26.11.2002 |
F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) |
Appeal |
6 |
|
28.10.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.10.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.10.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.10.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.10.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.10.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.10.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
03.06.2002 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.06.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.2002 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
21.05.2002 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
09.04.2002 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.04.2002 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.04.2002 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.04.2002 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.03.2002 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.03.2002 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.02.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.02.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.01.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.01.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.01.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.01.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.01.2002 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
22.01.2002 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.01.2002 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
9 |
|
19.12.2001 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.2001 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
19.12.2001 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.2001 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.12.2001 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.12.2001 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.2001 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.2001 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.10.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.10.2001 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.09.2001 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.07.2001 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.07.2001 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.07.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.06.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.06.2001 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.06.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.06.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.06.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.06.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.06.2001 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.06.2001 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.06.2001 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.06.2001 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.06.2001 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.05.2001 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.03.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.2001 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.02.2001 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.02.2001 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.2001 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.11.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.11.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.11.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.11.2000 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.11.2000 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.11.2000 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.10.2000 |
Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.10.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.10.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.10.2000 |
Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.09.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.09.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.08.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.08.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.08.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2000 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2000 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.06.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.06.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.06.2000 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.06.2000 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.2000 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.2000 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.2000 |
Refund of fees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.02.2000 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.02.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.02.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.2000 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.2000 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.01.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
13 |
|
28.12.1999 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.12.1999 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.1999 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
20.12.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
20.12.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
20.12.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
20.12.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
17.12.1999 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.12.1999 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.12.1999 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
17.12.1999 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
17.12.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
17.12.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
17.12.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
17.12.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
17.12.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
17.12.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
16.12.1999 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
15.12.1999 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
23 |
|
04.02.1999 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.1998 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.1998 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.1998 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.1998 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.08.1998 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.07.1998 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.07.1998 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
09.07.1998 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.06.1998 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.1998 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.02.1998 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.04.1997 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.1997 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.11.1996 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.09.1996 |
Refund order search fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.1996 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.06.1996 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.1996 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
20.02.1996 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.02.1996 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
20.02.1996 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.09.1995 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.08.1995 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
03.08.1995 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
03.08.1995 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
12 |