EP0734295 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THIN SLABS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1996/40] | CONTINUOUS CASTING FACILITY AND A PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THIN SLABS | ||
[2001/34] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 15.03.2002 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2002 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 02.05.2002 [2002/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMS Demag AG Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 4 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | [2000/49] |
Former [1998/14] | For all designated states MANNESMANN Aktiengesellschaft Mannesmannufer 2 40213 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [1996/40] | For all designated states MANNESMANN Aktiengesellschaft Mannesmannufer 2 D-40213 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PLESCHIUTSCHNIGG, Fritz-Peter Reiserweg 69 D-47269 Duisburg / DE | [1996/40] | Representative(s) | Meissner, Peter E., et al Meissner & Meissner Patentanwaltsbüro Hohenzollerndamm 89 14199 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/40] | Meissner, Peter E., Dipl.-Ing., et al Meissner & Meissner, Patentanwaltsbüro, Hohenzollerndamm 89 14199 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 95906269.6 | 20.01.1995 | [1996/40] | WO1995DE00095 | Priority number, date | DE19944403049 | 28.01.1994 Original published format: DE 4403049 | [1996/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9520445 | Date: | 03.08.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0734295 | Date: | 02.10.1996 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.08.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0734295 | Date: | 01.04.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/14] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0734295 | Date: | 02.05.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B22D11/12, B22D11/14, B22D11/10 | [1996/40] | CPC: |
B22D11/1206 (EP,US);
B22D11/111 (EP,US);
B22D11/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL [1996/40] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON DÜNNBRAMMEN | [2001/34] | English: | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THIN SLABS | [2001/34] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE BRAMES MINCES | [2001/34] |
Former [1996/40] | STRANGGIESSANLAGE UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON DÜNNBRAMMEN | ||
Former [1996/40] | CONTINUOUS CASTING FACILITY AND A PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THIN SLABS | ||
Former [1996/40] | INSTALLATION DE COULEE CONTINUE ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE BRAMES MINCES | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.1996 | National basic fee paid | 19.07.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.07.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.07.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.07.1996 | Examination requested [1996/40] | 18.09.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.09.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
17.10.1998
29.10.1998
ADMISSIBLE Voest-Alpine Industrieanlagenbau GmbH Turmstrasse 44 A-4020 Linz / AT Opponent's representative VA TECH Patente GmbH & Co Wolfgang-Pauli-Strasse 2 4020 Linz / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2001/22] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.10.1998
29.10.1998
ADMISSIBLE Voest-Alpine Industrieanlagenbau GmbH Turmstrasse 44 A-4020 Linz / AT Opponent's representative VA TECH Patente GmbH Stahlstrasse 21 a 4020 Linz / AT | ||
Former [1998/50] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.10.1998
29.10.1998
ADMISSIBLE Voest-Alpine Industrieanlagenbau GmbH Turmstrasse 44 A-4020 Linz / AT Opponent's representative Rieberer, Stefan VA TECH Patente GmbH & Co Stahlstrasse 21a 4020 Linz / AT | 05.02.1999 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 07.07.1999 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 06.04.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 15.08.2000 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 26.06.2001 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 26.06.2001 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.08.2001 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 08.08.2001 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 29.11.2001 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 13.02.2002 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO8801209 (MANNESMANN AG [DE]) [Y] 5,6,8 * page 4, line 12 - page 5, line 28; figures 1-7 *; | [A]EP0353402 (THYSSEN STAHL AG [DE]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [Y] - H.J.EHRENBERG ET AL, "giessen und giesswalzen dünner brammen bei der mannesmannröhren-werke ag", STAHL UND EISEN, DÜSSELDORF, (19890516), no. 9/10, pages 453 - 462, XP000068364 [Y] 5,6,8 * figures 3,4,6; table 1 * | Opposition | DE3423475 | - THE I.S.P. TECHNOLOGY, 4th International Iron and Steel Congress, Marrakech (Maroc), October 12-16, 1992 |