|
03.02.2011 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.02.2011 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.2011 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.12.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.12.2010 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.12.2010 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
9 |
|
24.12.2010 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
9 |
|
24.12.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.10.2010 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.10.2010 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2010 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.10.2010 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.10.2010 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.10.2010 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.10.2010 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.10.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.2010 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.02.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.02.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.01.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.01.2010 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.2010 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
40 |
|
22.01.2010 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.01.2010 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.01.2010 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.2009 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.2009 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.07.2009 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.05.2009 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.05.2009 |
Description |
Opposition |
23 |
|
20.05.2009 |
Drawings |
Opposition |
12 |
|
20.05.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.05.2009 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.01.2009 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.2009 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.01.2009 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.10.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.10.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.10.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.10.2008 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
17 |
|
15.09.2008 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
13 |
|
06.09.2008 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
05.09.2008 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.08.2008 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.08.2008 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.08.2008 |
Incoming letter in referral procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
16.06.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.06.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.06.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
11.06.2008 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
23.05.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.05.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.05.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.04.2008 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.04.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.04.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.04.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.04.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.04.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.04.2008 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.04.2008 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.04.2008 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.04.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.04.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.04.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.04.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.04.2008 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.04.2008 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.04.2008 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.04.2008 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.04.2008 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
13 |
|
03.04.2008 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
13 |
|
19.09.2007 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.09.2007 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.09.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.09.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.07.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.07.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.05.2007 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.05.2007 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
24.05.2007 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.04.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.04.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.04.2007 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
17 |
|
22.01.2007 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.01.2007 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.01.2007 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
04.01.2007 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.01.2007 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.09.2006 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.09.2006 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.09.2006 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.09.2006 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.09.2006 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
11.09.2006 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
11.09.2006 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.09.2006 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
16 |
|
24.07.2006 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.07.2006 |
Refund of fees |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.07.2006 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.07.2006 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.07.2006 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
29.06.2006 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.06.2006 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.06.2006 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.05.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.2006 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.05.2006 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
12 |
|
11.05.2006 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
11.05.2006 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
11.05.2006 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.05.2006 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.05.2006 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.05.2006 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.05.2006 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.05.2006 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
40 |
|
08.02.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
03.02.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
01.02.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.01.2006 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.01.2006 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.01.2006 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.01.2006 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.01.2006 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.01.2006 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.01.2006 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.01.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.01.2006 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.2005 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.11.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2005 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.11.2005 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.2005 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2005 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.05.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.04.2005 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
10 |
|
16.02.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.2005 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.02.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.10.2004 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.10.2004 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
43 |
|
19.08.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.08.2004 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.07.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.07.2004 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.07.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.05.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.05.2004 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.05.2004 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.05.2004 |
Request for change of representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.2004 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.2004 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.01.2004 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.12.2003 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
37 |
|
29.12.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.12.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
30 |
|
29.12.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
29.12.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
29.12.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
29.12.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
29.12.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
29.12.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
29.12.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
29.12.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
29.12.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
29.12.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
50 |
|
29.12.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.12.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
50 |
|
29.12.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.12.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
65 |
|
29.12.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
29.12.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
23 |
|
20.02.2003 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.08.2002 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
16.08.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
12.08.2002 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
52 |
|
22.07.2002 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.07.2002 |
Reply to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2002 |
Reply to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.04.2002 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.04.2002 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.04.2002 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
93 |
|
05.06.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.06.2001 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.06.2001 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.06.2001 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
01.06.2001 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
22.01.2001 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.12.1999 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
24.12.1999 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
24.12.1999 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.12.1999 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
13.12.1999 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.1999 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.07.1999 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.1997 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
09.05.1997 |
Description |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
09.05.1997 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
06.05.1997 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
27.12.1996 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.10.1996 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.1996 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.1996 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.1996 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.1996 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.1996 |
Delay of examination for Euro-PCT applications with WTO/TRIPS priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.1996 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.1996 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.06.1996 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.06.1996 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.1996 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
02.05.1996 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
12.09.1995 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.09.1995 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.08.1995 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.08.1995 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
100 |
|
03.08.1995 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
66 |