|
22.10.2008 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.10.2008 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.10.2008 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2008 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.09.2008 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.09.2008 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.09.2008 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.06.2008 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.06.2008 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.06.2008 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.06.2008 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.05.2008 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.05.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.04.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.04.2008 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
48 |
|
20.11.2007 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
25 |
|
08.11.2007 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
3 |
|
02.11.2007 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.11.2007 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
02.11.2007 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
26.10.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.10.2007 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
23.10.2007 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
19 |
|
23.10.2007 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
10.10.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.10.2007 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
05.10.2007 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
02.08.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.08.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.07.2007 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
20 |
|
26.07.2007 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
26.07.2007 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
65 |
|
26.07.2007 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.07.2007 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
26.07.2007 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
65 |
|
26.07.2007 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.07.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.07.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.07.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.07.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.07.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.07.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.07.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.07.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.07.2007 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.07.2007 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
6 |
|
05.07.2007 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
6 |
|
02.07.2007 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.07.2007 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.06.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.06.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.05.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.05.2007 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.05.2007 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.05.2007 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
10.05.2007 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
10.05.2007 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
10.05.2007 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
10.05.2007 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
01.02.2007 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.02.2007 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
01.02.2007 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
25.01.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.01.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.01.2007 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
17.01.2007 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
17.01.2007 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
16.01.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.01.2007 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
15 |
|
12.01.2007 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
46 |
|
12.01.2007 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
46 |
|
10.01.2007 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
42 |
|
07.09.2006 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.09.2006 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
31.08.2006 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.08.2006 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
31.08.2006 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
23.08.2006 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.08.2006 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
116 |
|
23.08.2006 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.08.2006 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.08.2006 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.08.2006 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
23.08.2006 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
23.08.2006 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.08.2006 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
28 |
|
23.08.2006 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.08.2006 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
23.08.2006 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.08.2006 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
23.08.2006 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
116 |
|
23.08.2006 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.08.2006 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
28 |
|
23.08.2006 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
17 |
|
22.08.2006 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.08.2006 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.08.2006 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
22.08.2006 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
22.08.2006 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
22.08.2006 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
22.08.2006 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
22.08.2006 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
22.08.2006 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
22.08.2006 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
22.08.2006 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
22.08.2006 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
7 |
|
18.08.2006 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
38 |
|
12.07.2006 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.06.2006 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
14.06.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.06.2006 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.06.2006 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.06.2006 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.06.2006 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.05.2006 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.04.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.04.2006 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.04.2006 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.04.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.04.2006 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
17 |
|
13.04.2006 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
20 |
|
13.04.2006 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.04.2006 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.04.2006 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
24 |
|
08.11.2005 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.11.2005 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.10.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.10.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.10.2005 |
Description |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.10.2005 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.10.2005 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
18.08.2005 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.08.2005 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.08.2005 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.07.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.07.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.07.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.07.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.03.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.2005 |
Description |
Opposition |
12 |
|
24.02.2005 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.2005 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
14 |
|
22.10.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.10.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.10.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.10.2004 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.09.2004 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.09.2004 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.2004 |
Description |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.09.2004 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.09.2004 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
7 |
|
09.09.2004 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.09.2004 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.08.2004 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.07.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
13.07.2004 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
22 |
|
03.05.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.04.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.04.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.04.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.04.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.04.2004 |
Drawings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.04.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
59 |
|
24.04.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
24.04.2004 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
14 |
|
23.04.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.04.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.04.2004 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.2004 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.2004 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
16.04.2004 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
97 |
|
15.04.2004 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.04.2004 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.2004 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.2004 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.02.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.02.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.02.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.02.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.02.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.2004 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.01.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.2004 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.01.2004 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.01.2004 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.01.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.01.2004 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.01.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.01.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.12.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.2003 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.12.2003 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
9 |
|
23.09.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.09.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.08.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
29.08.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.08.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.08.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.08.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
29.08.2003 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
11.06.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.06.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.06.2003 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.05.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.05.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
3 |
|
29.04.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.2003 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.04.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.04.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.03.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.03.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.03.2003 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.02.2003 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.2003 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.2003 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.12.2002 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.2002 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.08.2002 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.08.2002 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.08.2002 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.07.2002 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.07.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.07.2002 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.2002 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
04.07.2002 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
14 |
|
04.07.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
04.07.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
52 |
|
04.07.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
28 |
|
04.07.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
04.07.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
04.07.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
48 |
|
03.07.2002 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
03.07.2002 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.07.2002 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
03.07.2002 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
15 |
|
03.07.2002 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
03.07.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.07.2002 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
02.07.2002 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.07.2002 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
02.07.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.08.2001 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2001 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2001 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.05.2001 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.02.2001 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.01.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.01.2001 |
Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.2000 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.10.2000 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
54 |
|
13.09.2000 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.07.2000 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.07.2000 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.03.2000 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.02.2000 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.02.2000 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.12.1999 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.1999 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.1999 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.1999 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.12.1998 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.12.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.12.1998 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.08.1998 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.10.1997 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.10.1997 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.1996 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.1996 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
60 |
|
11.07.1996 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.1996 |
Invitation to file priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.1996 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.06.1996 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.05.1996 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.05.1996 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.1996 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.1996 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.1996 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.1996 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.03.1996 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
15.02.1996 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.02.1996 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
48 |
|
15.02.1996 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
50 |