EP0746778 - METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR DETECTING AND IMAGING PARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 28.07.2001 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.2001 | Refusal of application | published on 12.09.2001 [2001/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MASSACHUSETTS INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY 77 Massachusetts Avenue Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | For all designated states BAYLOR COLLEGE OF MEDICINE One Baylor Plaza Houston, TX 77030 / US | For all designated states HOUSTON ADVANCED RESEARCH CENTER 4800 Research Center Drive The Woodlands, TX 77381 / US | [1996/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EGGERS, Mitchell, D. 10 Plum Cover Court The Woodlands, TX 77381 / US | 02 /
HOGAN, Michael, E. 103 Golden Shadow Circle The Woodlands, TX 77381 / US | 03 /
EHRLICH, Daniel, J. 11 Grant Place Lexington, MA 02173 / US | 04 /
HOLLIS, Mark, A. 77 Lexington Road Concord, MA 01742 / US | 05 /
KOSICKI, Bernard, B. 39 Fort Pond Road Acton, MA 01720 / US | 06 /
REICH, Robert 146 Wellman Avenue North Chelmsford, MA 01863 / US | 07 /
BURKE, Barry, E. 17 Sherburne Road Lexington, MA 02173 / US | [1996/50] | Representative(s) | Greenwood, John David, et al Graham Watt & Co LLP St Botolph's House 7-9 St Botolph's Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/50] | Greenwood, John David, et al Graham Watt & Co. Riverhead Sevenoaks Kent TN13 2BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 95911678.1 | 09.02.1995 | [1996/50] | WO1995US01725 | Priority number, date | US19940201651 | 25.02.1994 Original published format: US 201651 | [1996/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9523348 | Date: | 31.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0746778 | Date: | 11.12.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.08.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G01T1/29, G01T1/164 | [1996/50] | CPC: |
G01T1/2928 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/50] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND APPARAT FÜR DEN NACHWEIS VON TEILCHEN UND DIE ABBILDUNGDURCH DIESE TEILCHEN | [1996/50] | English: | METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR DETECTING AND IMAGING PARTICLES | [1996/50] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE DETECTION ET D'IMAGERIE DE PARTICULES | [1996/50] | Entry into regional phase | 25.09.1996 | National basic fee paid | 25.09.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.09.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.09.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.09.1996 | Examination requested [1996/50] | 27.09.1996 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.10.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2001/37] | 22.04.2001 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2001/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2001 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4882494 (ROGERS ET AL.) [X] 1-3,8,14-16,18; | [X]EP0583118 (SUMMIT WORLD TRADE CORPORATION) [X] 1-3; | [XA]EP0421869 (COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE) [X] 1 [A] 2,24 | [XA] - JACKSON P. et al., "Rapid imaging, using a cooled CCD, of fluorescent two-dimension- al polyacrylamide gels produced by labelling proteins in the first- -dimensional isoelectric focusing gel with the fluoro- phore 2-methoxy-2,4-diphenyl- -3(2H)furanone", ELECTROPHORESIS, (1988), vol. 9, pages 330 - 339 [X] 1,4,8,9,19,23 [A] 20,21,22 | [X] - SWEEDLER J.V. et al., "Fluorescence Detection in Capillary Zone Electro- phoresis Using a CCD with Time-Delayed Integration", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, (199101), vol. 63, no. 1, pages 496 - 502 [X] 1,4,7,8,9,19 | [XA] - CHAN K.C. et al., "On-Line Detection of DNA in Gel Electrophoresis by Ultra- violet Absorption Utilizing a CCD Imaging System", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTY, (199104), vol. 63, no. 7, pages 746 - 750 [X] 19 [A] 20-23 |