|
16.10.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2007 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.2007 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.2007 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.10.2007 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.2007 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.08.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.08.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.08.2007 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.08.2007 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.08.2007 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.08.2007 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.08.2007 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.08.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.08.2007 |
New pages for Druckexemplar |
Opposition |
34 |
|
26.07.2007 |
Fax filed during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.07.2007 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.07.2007 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.07.2007 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.06.2007 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.06.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.08.2006 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.08.2006 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
6 |
|
08.08.2006 |
Title page: Decision (inter partes / maintenance of the patent as amended) |
Appeal |
6 |
|
14.07.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.07.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.07.2006 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
10.07.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.07.2006 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
25.04.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.04.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.04.2006 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
4 |
|
07.04.2006 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.04.2006 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
01.07.2004 |
Change of composition of the board (except boards 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.05.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.05.2004 |
Annex |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.05.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
13.04.2004 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.04.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.04.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.02.2004 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.01.2004 |
F3313 Order: change of Board due to the technical aspects of the appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.12.2003 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.12.2003 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.12.2003 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
31 |
|
17.10.2003 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.10.2003 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.09.2003 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.09.2003 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
02.08.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.07.2003 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
9 |
|
28.07.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
6 |
|
28.07.2003 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.07.2003 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
10 |
|
28.07.2003 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.07.2003 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.07.2003 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
36 |
|
10.06.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.06.2003 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
06.06.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.05.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.05.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.05.2003 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
4 |
|
16.05.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.05.2003 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
7 |
|
12.05.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
6 |
|
12.05.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
10 |
|
12.05.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.05.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
12.05.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
31.03.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.02.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.02.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.02.2003 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
26.02.2003 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.02.2003 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.02.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.01.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.2003 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.01.2003 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.11.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.10.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.01.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.01.2002 |
Request for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.06.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.06.2001 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
3 |
|
19.06.2001 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
19.06.2001 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.06.2001 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
29.03.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.2001 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.03.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.2000 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.2000 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.2000 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
06.12.2000 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.12.2000 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
06.12.2000 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
06.12.2000 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
29.11.2000 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.2000 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
30.12.1999 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.10.1999 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.10.1999 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
26.10.1999 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
58 |
|
26.10.1999 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.10.1999 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.07.1999 |
Filing of a translation of the previous application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.1999 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.07.1999 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.06.1999 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.06.1999 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
51 |
|
25.05.1999 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.05.1999 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.05.1999 |
Transmittal of third party observations to applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.04.1999 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
29.04.1999 |
Patent document filed by a Third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.04.1999 |
Patent document filed by a Third party |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
29.04.1999 |
Patent document filed by a Third party |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.01.1999 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.01.1999 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.01.1999 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.01.1999 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.01.1999 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.09.1998 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.02.1997 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.1996 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.1996 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.1996 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.04.1996 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.1995 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.1995 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.12.1995 |
Description |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
04.12.1995 |
Description |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
04.12.1995 |
Description |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
04.12.1995 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
04.12.1995 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
20.10.1995 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.09.1995 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.09.1995 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
68 |
|
21.09.1995 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
21.09.1995 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
58 |