EP0754338 - IMAGE DISPLAY SYSTEM ALLOWING MULTIPLE USERS TO VIEW A SINGLE DISPLAY OR A SINGLE USER TO VIEW MULTIPLE DISPLAYS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.02.2001 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/04] | For all designated states THE BOEING COMPANY P.O. Box 3707, M.S. 13-08 Seattle, Washington 98124-2207 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NEWSOME, Donald, E. 16605 127th Avenue Southeast Renton, WA 98124 / US | [1997/04] | Representative(s) | Land, Addick Adrianus Gosling, et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Land, Addick Adrianus Gosling, et al Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [1997/04] | Land, Addick Adrianus Gosling, et al Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 95913774.6 | 20.03.1995 | [1997/04] | WO1995US03450 | Priority number, date | US19940224401 | 07.04.1994 Original published format: US 224401 | [1997/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9527973 | Date: | 19.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0754338 | Date: | 22.01.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.10.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/36 | [1997/04] | CPC: |
G09G3/36 (EP);
G09G2320/028 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/04] | Title | German: | BILDANZEIGESYSTEM, DAS DIE BEOBACHTUNG VON EINER EINZIGEN ANZEIGE DURCH MEHRERE BENUTZER ODER DIE BEOBACHTUNG VON MEHREREN ANZEIGEN DURCH EINEN EINZIGEN BENUTZER GESTATTET | [1997/04] | English: | IMAGE DISPLAY SYSTEM ALLOWING MULTIPLE USERS TO VIEW A SINGLE DISPLAY OR A SINGLE USER TO VIEW MULTIPLE DISPLAYS | [1997/04] | French: | SYSTEME D'AFFICHAGE PERMETTANT A PLUSIEURS UTILISATEURS DE VOIR UN MEME ECRAN OU A UN SEUL, D'EN VOIR PLUSIEURS | [1997/04] | Entry into regional phase | 12.09.1996 | National basic fee paid | 12.09.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.09.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.11.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 12.09.1996 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.09.1996 | Examination requested [1997/04] | 04.07.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.10.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/12] | 26.10.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2001/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2000 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0539261 (SEXTANT AVIONIQUE) [A] 1,24 * abstract * * claim 1 *; | [A]EP0221582 (N.V. PHILIPS' GLOEILAMPENFABRIEKEN) [A] 1,6-9 * abstract * * column 1, line 12 - column 1, line 47 * |