EP0704199 - TRANSFUSION CONTAINER, TRANSFUSION PREPARATION, AND COMPREHENSIVE VITAMIN-CONTAINING HIGH-CALORIE TRANSFUSION PREPARATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 06.05.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2005 | Revocation of patent | published on 22.06.2005 [2005/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Pharma Corporation 6-9, Hiranomachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0046 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/05] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Pharma Corporation 6-9, Hiranomachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0046 / JP | ||
Former [2001/18] | For all designated states Welfide Corporation 6-9, Hirano-machi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka / JP | ||
Former [2000/48] | For all designated states WelFide Corporation 6-9, Hiranomachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka / JP | ||
Former [1999/22] | For all designated states Yoshitomi Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. 6-9, Hirano-machi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | ||
Former [1996/14] | For all designated states THE GREEN CROSS CORPORATION 3-3, Imabashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIDO, Takae The Green Cross Corporation 25-1, Shodai-Ohtani 2-chome Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573 / JP | 02 /
KODAIRA, Hideto The Green Cross Corporation 25-1, Shodai-Ohtani 2-chome Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573 / JP | 03 /
MUNECHIKA, Koji The Green Cross Corporation 25-1, Shodai-Ohtani 2-chome Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573 / JP | 04 /
Ii, Shigeo The Green Cross Corporation 3-3, Imabashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541 / JP | 05 /
ABE, Shunichi The Green Cross Corporation 25-1, Shodai-Ohtani 2-chome Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573 / JP | 06 /
YOKOYAMA, Kazumasa The Green Cross Corporation 3-3, Imabashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541 / JP | [1996/52] |
Former [1996/14] | 01 /
KIDO, Takae The Green Cross Corporation 25-1, Shodai-Ohtani 2-chome Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573 / JP | ||
02 /
KODAIRA, Hideto The Green Cross Corporation 25-1, Shodai-Ohtani 2-chome Hirahata-shi, Osaka 573-chom / JP | |||
03 /
MUNECHIKA, Koji The Green Cross Corporation 25-1, Shodai-Ohtani 2-chome Hirahata-shi, Osaka 573-chom / JP | |||
04 /
Ii, Shigeo The Green Cross Corporation 3-3, Imabashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541 / JP | |||
05 /
ABE, Shunichi The Green Cross Corporation 25-1, Shodai-Ohtani 2-chome Hirahata-shi, Osaka 573 / JP | |||
06 /
YOKOYAMA, Kazumasa The Green Cross Corporation 3-3, Imabashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541 / JP | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/14] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 D-81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95916019.3 | 20.04.1995 | [1996/14] | WO1995JP00778 | Priority number, date | JP19940106097 | 20.04.1994 Original published format: JP 10609794 | [1996/14] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9528906 | Date: | 02.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0704199 | Date: | 03.04.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.11.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0704199 | Date: | 19.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.11.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61J1/00, A61K9/00, A61K45/06 | [1998/16] | CPC: |
A61K9/0029 (EP,US);
A61J1/05 (KR);
A61J1/2093 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61J1/10 (EP,US);
A61J1/2034 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1996/14] | A61J1/05, A61K9/08 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1996/14] | Title | German: | TRANSFUSIONSBEHÄLTER,TRANSFUSIONSPRÄPARAT SOWIE UMFASSENDES,VITAMINE ENTHALTENDES,KALORIEREICHES PRÄPARAT | [1996/14] | English: | TRANSFUSION CONTAINER, TRANSFUSION PREPARATION, AND COMPREHENSIVE VITAMIN-CONTAINING HIGH-CALORIE TRANSFUSION PREPARATION | [1996/14] | French: | RECIPIENT DE PERFUSION, PREPARATION D'UN SOLUTE ET SOLUTE VITAMINE HAUTEMENT CALORIQUE COMPLET | [1996/14] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.1995 | Translation filed | 19.12.1995 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.1995 | Search fee paid | 19.12.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.1995 | Examination requested [1996/14] | 21.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 16.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
17.12.2003
ADMISSIBLE B. Braun Melsungen AG Carl-Braun-Str. 1 D-34212 Melsungen / DE Opponent's representative Schwarzensteiner, Marie-Luise Grape & Schwarzensteiner Patentanwälte Sebastiansplatz 7 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/07] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.12.2003
ADMISSIBLE B. BRAUN MELSUNGEN AG Carl-Braun-Str. 1 D-34212 Melsungen / DE Opponent's representative Schwarzensteiner, Marie-Luise, Dr. Grape & Schwarzensteiner Patentanwälte Sebastiansplatz 7 80331 München / DE | 26.01.2004 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 13.01.2005 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 20.01.2005 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 30.01.2005 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2005/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PXL]WO9408548 (GREEN CROSS CORP [JP], et al) [PXL] 1-6,8-10 * the whole document *; | [EL]EP0747033 (GREEN CROSS CORP [JP]) [EL] 1-6,8-10 * the whole document *; | [XA]EP0510687 (GREEN CROSS CORP [JP]) [X] 9,10 * column W * [A] 1-6,8; | [X]GB1464797 (AMERICAN CYANAMID CO) [X] 7 * the whole document *; | [XA]JPS6158560 ; | [A]JPS62135421 ; | [A]JPS58162515 ; | [A]JPS58162517 ; | [A]US4005190 (MADER HELMUT, et al) [A] 1-6 * column A * * column 2, line 24 - line 35; examples 1,2,5; claim 1 * | [XA] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 86, no. 18, Database accession no. 86-117187, XP002055228 & JPS6158560 A 00000000 (NIPPON OIL & FATS KK) [X] 9,10 * abstract * [A] 1-6,8 | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 87, no. 30, Database accession no. 87-209279, XP002055229 & JPS62135421 A 00000000 (KASAI) [A] 1-10 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 83, no. 44, Database accession no. 83-805362, XP002055230 & JPS58162515 A 00000000 (TANABE SEIYAKU) [A] 1-10 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19831220), vol. 7, no. 285, Database accession no. (C - 201), & JP58162517 A 00000000 (IMAGAWA TAKASHI) [A] 1-6,8-10 * abstract * | International search | [A]JPH04144561 (MORISHITA PHARMA); | [A]JPH0531151 (GREEN CROSS CORP); | [A]JPS6328892B |