EP0754033 - HETEROFUNCTIONAL, MUCOADHESIVE DOSAGE FORM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.09.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biotec Centre S.A. 12, avenue de Concyr 45071 Orléans Cédex 2 / FR | [1997/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROMET, Norbert Emile L'Orée-de-Sologne 3, rue Gustave-Flaubert F-45100 Orléans-la-Source / FR | [1997/04] | Representative(s) | Desaix, Anne Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1997/04] | Desaix, Anne Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A. 3, rue Chauveau-Lagarde 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 95916694.3 | 31.03.1995 | [1997/04] | WO1995FR00417 | Priority number, date | FR19940003895 | 01.04.1994 Original published format: FR 9403895 | [1997/04] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9526713 | Date: | 12.10.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0754033 | Date: | 22.01.1997 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.10.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0754033 | Date: | 03.11.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/24, A61K31/40 | [1997/04] | CPC: |
A61K9/209 (EP,US);
A61K31/40 (EP,US);
A61K9/006 (EP,US);
A61P25/20 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/04] | Title | German: | HETEROFUNKTIONELLE MUCOADHÄSIVE GALENISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [1997/04] | English: | HETEROFUNCTIONAL, MUCOADHESIVE DOSAGE FORM | [1997/04] | French: | COMPOSITION GALENIQUE MUCOADHESIVE HETEROFONCTIONNELLE | [1997/04] | Entry into regional phase | 30.09.1996 | National basic fee paid | 30.09.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.09.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.09.1996 | Examination requested [1997/04] | 11.03.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.04.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.08.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1997 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   21.05.1997 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.11.1999 | ES | 03.11.1999 | GR | 03.11.1999 | IE | 03.11.1999 | IT | 03.11.1999 | NL | 03.11.1999 | SE | 03.11.1999 | DK | 03.02.2000 | PT | 03.02.2000 | DE | 04.02.2000 | BE | 31.03.2000 | LU | 31.03.2000 | [2008/06] |
Former [2007/29] | AT | 03.11.1999 | |
ES | 03.11.1999 | ||
GR | 03.11.1999 | ||
IE | 03.11.1999 | ||
NL | 03.11.1999 | ||
SE | 03.11.1999 | ||
DK | 03.02.2000 | ||
PT | 03.02.2000 | ||
DE | 04.02.2000 | ||
BE | 31.03.2000 | ||
LU | 31.03.2000 | ||
Former [2004/07] | AT | 03.11.1999 | |
ES | 03.11.1999 | ||
GR | 03.11.1999 | ||
IE | 03.11.1999 | ||
NL | 03.11.1999 | ||
SE | 03.11.1999 | ||
DK | 03.02.2000 | ||
PT | 03.02.2000 | ||
DE | 04.02.2000 | ||
BE | 31.03.2000 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 03.11.1999 | |
ES | 03.11.1999 | ||
IE | 03.11.1999 | ||
NL | 03.11.1999 | ||
SE | 03.11.1999 | ||
DK | 03.02.2000 | ||
PT | 03.02.2000 | ||
DE | 04.02.2000 | ||
BE | 31.03.2000 | ||
Former [2003/17] | AT | 03.11.1999 | |
ES | 03.11.1999 | ||
IE | 03.11.1999 | ||
NL | 03.11.1999 | ||
SE | 03.11.1999 | ||
PT | 03.02.2000 | ||
DE | 04.02.2000 | ||
BE | 31.03.2000 | ||
MC | 31.03.2000 | ||
Former [2003/08] | AT | 03.11.1999 | |
ES | 03.11.1999 | ||
IE | 03.11.1999 | ||
NL | 03.11.1999 | ||
SE | 03.11.1999 | ||
PT | 03.02.2000 | ||
DE | 04.02.2000 | ||
BE | 31.03.2000 | ||
Former [2002/26] | AT | 03.11.1999 | |
ES | 03.11.1999 | ||
IE | 03.11.1999 | ||
SE | 03.11.1999 | ||
PT | 03.02.2000 | ||
DE | 04.02.2000 | ||
BE | 31.03.2000 | ||
Former [2002/23] | AT | 03.11.1999 | |
IE | 03.11.1999 | ||
SE | 03.11.1999 | ||
PT | 03.02.2000 | ||
DE | 04.02.2000 | ||
BE | 31.03.2000 | ||
Former [2002/22] | AT | 03.11.1999 | |
IE | 03.11.1999 | ||
PT | 03.02.2000 | ||
DE | 04.02.2000 | ||
BE | 31.03.2000 | ||
Former [2002/09] | AT | 03.11.1999 | |
PT | 03.02.2000 | ||
DE | 04.02.2000 | ||
BE | 31.03.2000 | ||
Former [2001/17] | AT | 03.11.1999 | |
IE | 03.11.1999 | ||
PT | 03.02.2000 | ||
BE | 31.03.2000 | ||
Former [2001/11] | AT | 03.11.1999 | |
PT | 03.02.2000 | ||
BE | 31.03.2000 | ||
Former [2000/51] | AT | 03.11.1999 | |
PT | 03.02.2000 | ||
Former [2000/43] | PT | 03.02.2000 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0020777 (TEIJIN LTD [JP]) [A] 1-13 * page 2, line 26 - line 36 * * page 4, line 5 - line 28 * * page 6, line 18 - line 35 * * page 9, line 20 * * page 10, line 2 - page 12 *; | [A]US4250163 (IKURA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column W *; | [A]EP0159604 (TOYO BOSEKI [JP]) [A] 1-13 * page 2, line 23 - page 10, line 14 * * page 38, line 22 - page 42, line 14 * * figures 13-16 *; | [A]WO8704342 (KEY PHARMA [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [AD]WO9106290 (RIKER LABORATORIES INC [US]) [AD] 1-13 * page 44; example 64 *; | [AD]EP0518468 (NEURIM PHARMA 1991 [IL]) [AD] 10-13* page 2, line 49 - page 3, line 12 * |