|
26.01.2010 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.2007 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.01.2007 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
21 |
|
21.12.2006 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
6 |
|
13.12.2006 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.12.2006 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.12.2006 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
4 |
|
05.12.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.12.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.11.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.11.2006 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.11.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.11.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.11.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.11.2006 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.11.2006 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.11.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.08.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.08.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.08.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.08.2006 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
11 |
|
31.07.2006 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.07.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.2005 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
24.05.2005 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.05.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.05.2005 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.05.2005 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
10.05.2005 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
10.05.2005 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.01.2005 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.01.2005 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.01.2005 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
10 |
|
30.12.2004 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.12.2004 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
30.12.2004 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
9 |
|
23.12.2004 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
27 |
|
15.11.2004 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.11.2004 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.11.2004 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.11.2004 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.11.2004 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.11.2004 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.10.2004 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.10.2004 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.10.2004 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.09.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.08.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.08.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.08.2004 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.08.2004 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
10 |
|
23.08.2004 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.08.2004 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.08.2004 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
11 |
|
19.07.2004 |
Decision of the Opposition Division |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.06.2004 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.06.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
22.06.2004 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.05.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.05.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.05.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.05.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.05.2004 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
18.05.2004 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.05.2004 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.05.2004 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.05.2004 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.03.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.03.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.03.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.03.2004 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.03.2004 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.03.2004 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2004 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.10.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.09.2003 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.05.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.2003 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.05.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
03.05.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
28.01.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2003 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
28.11.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.2002 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.2002 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.07.2002 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.07.2002 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.05.2002 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.2002 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
08.05.2002 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.2002 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
02.05.2002 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
02.05.2002 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.05.2002 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
02.05.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.05.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.05.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.05.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.05.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
02.05.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.05.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
02.05.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.05.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.05.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.05.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
02.05.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
02.05.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.06.2001 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2001 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2001 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.04.2001 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
29.01.2001 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.01.2001 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.09.2000 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.09.2000 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
18.08.2000 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.02.2000 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.02.2000 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.02.2000 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.10.1999 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.12.1998 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.12.1998 |
Description |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
09.12.1998 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.08.1998 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.03.1996 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.02.1996 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.02.1996 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.02.1996 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.1996 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.12.1995 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.12.1995 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.11.1995 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.11.1995 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
23.11.1995 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
42 |